Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Alexandria, Virginia
Plaintiff: Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: City of Alexandria, Virginia
Case Number: 1:2022cv00506
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
2 Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 ***Deadlines terminated - Final Pretrial Conference - TERMINATED - per Order entered on 01/04/23. (wgar, )
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Stay Pending Settlement Negotiations. ORDERED that all existing discovery and trial deadlines are stayed an additional 60 days while the parties engage in settlement negotiations. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/3/2023. (swil)
December 22, 2022 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Stay Pending Settlement Negotiations by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Savage, Justin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Settlement Negotiations; and it is further ORDERED that all existing discovery and trial deadlines are stayed an additional 60 days while the parties engage in settlement negotiations. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/31/2022. (nneb)
October 28, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Settlement Negotiations by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Savage, Justin)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that this case is stayed for thirty (30) days from the date of this Order while the parties engage in settlement negotiations through mediation. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the discovery deadline is extended to Friday, January 13, 2023, and the Final Pretrial Conference is continued to Thursday, January 19, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/21/2022. (nneb)
September 21, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings Discovery due by 1/13/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (nneb)
September 16, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Refer Case To Mediation by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Savage, Justin)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Certain Discovery Deadlines (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/25/2022. (nneb)
August 24, 2022 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Certain Discovery Deadlines by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Savage, Justin)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard H Sedgley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/3/2022. (nneb)
August 3, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. Sedgley by City of Alexandria, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Calamita, Frank)
August 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Paul Calamita, III on behalf of City of Alexandria, Virginia (Calamita, Frank)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Revised Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 16) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 14) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, December 9, 2022. 2. The Revised Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, August 3, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by Tuesday, June 21, 2022.5. No general objection may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/18/22. (tfitz, )
July 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
July 15, 2022 Filing 16 Revised Joint Discovery Plan by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc..(Savage, Justin)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/14/2022. (clar, )
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(kgall)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 Joint Discovery Plan by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc..(Savage, Justin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Alexandria, Virginia.(Sedgley, Richard)
May 19, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rose Quam-Wickham and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Savage Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8397920. by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Brewer for Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 05/16/2022. (clar, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Marshall Morales for Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 5/16/2022. (clar, )
May 12, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc. City of Alexandria, Virginia served on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022 (Savage, Justin)
May 10, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Alexandria, Virginia, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marshall Morales and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Savage Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8381246. by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Brewer and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Savage Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8381234. by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Savage, Justin)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8380671.), filed by Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Savage, Justin)
May 9, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (nneb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc. v. City of Alexandria, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potomac Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Justin A. Savage
Represented By: Marshall Morales
Represented By: Matthew Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria, Virginia
Represented By: Richard H Sedgley
Represented By: Frank Paul Calamita, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?