Hall et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Andre Hall and Jermaine Minitee
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation, The Board of Trustees of Capital One Financial Corporation, The Benefits Committee of the Capital One Financial Corporation Savings Plan and Does No. 1-20
Case Number: 1:2022cv00857
Filed: August 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Claude Roberts for Andre Hall,John Claude Roberts for Jermaine Minitee. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/7/2022. (nneb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Edward Miller for Andre Hall,James Edward Miller for Jermaine Minitee. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/7/2022. (nneb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Craig Shah for Andre Hall,James Craig Shah for Jermaine Minitee. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/7/2022. (nneb)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Alec Jacob Berin for Andre Hall,Alec Jacob Berin for Jermaine Minitee. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/7/2022. (nneb)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Claude Roberts and Certification of Local Counsel Glenn E. Chappell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8554581. by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Edward Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Glenn E. Chappell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8554578. by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Craig Shah and Certification of Local Counsel Glenn E. Chappell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8554573. by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alec Jacob Berin and Certification of Local Counsel Glenn E. Chappell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8554562. by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Sharbaugh on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation, The Benefits Committee of the Capital One Financial Corporation Savings Plan, The Board of Trustees of Capital One Financial Corporation (Sharbaugh, Matthew)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022; The Benefits Committee of the Capital One Financial Corporation Savings Plan waiver sent on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022; The Board of Trustees of Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 8/17/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Chappell, Glenn)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, The Benefits Committee of the Capital One Financial Corporation Savings Plan, The Board of Trustees of Capital One Financial Corporation, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re Civil Cover Sheet. The filing user has been notified to refile the Civil Cover Sheet with the filing attorney's signature. (dvanm)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (jlan)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Chappell, Glenn)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8500492.), filed by Andre Hall, Jermaine Minitee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chappell, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Hall
Represented By: Glenn Edward Chappell
Represented By: John Claude Roberts
Represented By: Alec Jacob Berin
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James Craig Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Minitee
Represented By: Glenn Edward Chappell
Represented By: John Claude Roberts
Represented By: Alec Jacob Berin
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: James Craig Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Matthew James Sharbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Matthew James Sharbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Benefits Committee of the Capital One Financial Corporation Savings Plan
Represented By: Matthew James Sharbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does No. 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?