United States of America v. Wilkinson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: UNITED STATES, JAMIE WILKINSON and Jaime C. Wilkinson
Case Number: 1:2022cv01207
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant's Response to #9 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Jaime C. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Envelope)(dvanm)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America (Mene, Gerard)
November 30, 2022 Notice of Correction re #8 Summons Returned Executed. Unfortunately, the document does not provide a service date on second page. The filer has been notified to refile the summons return executed with a service date. (Dest)
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Show Authority filed by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
November 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America All Defendants (Mene, Gerard)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Show Authority by Jaime C. Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2022: #2 Envelope) (jlan, ).
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Michaelle Dale Bruce on behalf of United States of America (Bruce, Elisabeth)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Anna Accomazzo Miller for United States of America. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 11/18/2022. (nneb)
November 16, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anna A. Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jaime C. Wilkinson, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
October 27, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (jlan)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES. (Mene, Gerard)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mene, Gerard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE WILKINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime C. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anna Accomazzo Miller
Represented By: Elisabeth Michaelle Dale Bruce
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?