Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC V. Orion Management, LLC
Defendant: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC and Orion Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01238
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Orion Management, LLC. (nlop)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 Declaration re #9 Request for Entry of Default as to Orion Management LLC by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Coleman, Brian)
December 9, 2022 Notice of Correction re #9 Request for Entry of Default as to Orion Management LLC. Unfortunately, an Affidavit or Declaration was not filed in support of the Request for Entry of Default. The filing user has been notified to file an Affidavit or Declaration. (nlop)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default as to Orion Management LLC by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Coleman, Brian)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Plaintiff immediately obtain a default from the Clerk pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a); and it is further ORDERED that promptly after obtaining entry of default, Plaintiff file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum setting forth the factual and legal support of findings; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff file a Notice setting the hearing on the the motion for default judgment for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 6, 2023, before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred and mail and email copies of the notice, motion, and memorandum to the Defendants at their last know addresses, certifying the same to the Court (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/6/2022. (swil)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint. Exhibit A to the Complaint will be maintained under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davison 11/22/2022. (Dest). Modified on 11/23/2022 (Dest).
November 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Orion Management, LLC served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022 for Complaint, Summons, Motion to Seal, Financial Interest Disclosure served on Jason Collins, Registered Agent filed by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Coleman, Brian) Modified to correct filing event on 11/14/2022 (Dest).
November 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Orion Management, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney) (nlop)
November 2, 2022 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Coleman, Brian) (nlop).
November 1, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (nlop)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Brian)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC of Disclosure of Financial Interests (Coleman, Brian)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8639438.), filed by Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Placeholder), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC V. Orion Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Security Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian Arthur Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?