Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait v. Naffa et al
Plaintiff: Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait and Ministry of Health of the State of Kuwait
Defendant: Joseph Mohammad Naffa and Naffa & Associates, LLP
Case Number: 1:2022cv01270
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 26 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ministry of Health of the State of Kuwait. (Smith, Evan)
December 30, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Ronald Smith on behalf of Ministry of Health of the State of Kuwait (Smith, Evan)
December 30, 2022 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service re #23 Amended Complaint by Evan Ronald Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Evan)
December 30, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT of the Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait and the Ministry of Health of the State of Kuwait against All Defendants, filed by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait.(Smith, Evan)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 First Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that plaintiff shall immediately file the proposed amended (Docket 20-1) as a separate docket entry. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss scheduled for Friday, January 6, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/30/2022. (swil)
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, and add Second Plaintiff filed by Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP. (Connolly, Thomas)
December 27, 2022 Notice of Correction re #20 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, and add Second Plaintiff. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Waiver of Oral Argument. (swil)
December 23, 2022 Filing 20 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, and add Second Plaintiff by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit II - Alternative First Amended Complaint)(Smith, Evan)
December 22, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP. (Connolly, Thomas)
December 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Gerard Connolly on behalf of Naffa & Associates, LLP (Connolly, Thomas)
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants filed by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Smith, Evan)
December 8, 2022 Set Deadline as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (wgar, )
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Thomas Brent Mason for Joseph Mohammad Naffa. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/6/2022. (nneb)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Timothy Joseph Simeone for Joseph Mohammad Naffa. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/6/2022. (nneb)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP Disclosure of Citizenship (Connolly, Thomas)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Connolly, Thomas)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UPL Committee Letter)(Connolly, Thomas)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP. (Connolly, Thomas)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy J. Simeone and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas G. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8695038. by Joseph Mohammad Naffa. (Connolly, Thomas)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas B. Mason and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas G. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number BVAEDC-8694962. by Joseph Mohammad Naffa. (Connolly, Thomas)
November 17, 2022 Notice of Correction re #8 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service. Unfortunately, the documents were filed using the wrong docket event. The "Summons Returned Executed" event was incorrectly filed as "Certificate of Service." The clerk's office staff corrected this error. No further action is required at this time. (Dest)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Naffa & Associates, LLP served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022 by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait (Smith, Evan). Modified to correct filing event on 11/17/2022 (Dest).
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Joseph Mohammad Naffa served on 11/15/2022, answer due 12/6/2022 by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait (Smith, Evan). Modified to correct filing event on 11/17/2022 (Dest).
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joseph Mohammad Naffa, Naffa & Associates, LLP, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Dest, )
November 10, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dest)
November 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Ronald Smith on behalf of Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait (Smith, Evan) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Smith, Evan) (Main Document 4 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Naffa & Associates, LLP by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Smith, Evan) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Joseph M. Naffa by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Smith, Evan) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8656381.), filed by Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Evan) (Attachment 1 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait v. Naffa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ministry of Defence of the State of Kuwait
Represented By: Evan Ronald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ministry of Health of the State of Kuwait
Represented By: Evan Ronald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mohammad Naffa
Represented By: Thomas Brent Mason
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Simeone
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naffa & Associates, LLP
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?