Anwar Hassan v. Barzani
Plaintiff: Shnyar Anwar Hassan
Defendant: Masrour Barzani
Case Number: 1:2022cv01288
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 AFFIDAVIT Requesting Foreign Mailing (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/9/2023. (nlop)
December 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Rowley, III on behalf of Shnyar Anwar Hassan (Rowley, John)
December 16, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT Requesting Foreign Mailing by Shnyar Anwar Hassan. (Rowley, John)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Stiles Irving, IV for Shnyar Anwar Hassan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/16/2022. (nneb)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Masrour Barzani, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Dest)
November 14, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Dest)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Stiles Irving IV and Certification of Local Counsel John P. Rowley III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8658254. by Shnyar Anwar Hassan. (Morse, Adriaen) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct pdf fillable form on 11/15/2022) (Dest).
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Shnyar Anwar Hassan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Morse, Adriaen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2022) (Dest, ).
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8658178.), filed by Shnyar Anwar Hassan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morse, Adriaen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anwar Hassan v. Barzani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shnyar Anwar Hassan
Represented By: Adriaen Meredith Morse, Jr.
Represented By: John Stiles Irving, IV
Represented By: John Patrick Rowley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masrour Barzani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?