Caplen v. Sekas et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Caplen
Defendant: John P. Sekas, Reston Valley, L.C., Connor Sekas, Frederick Lowry, Air Control, LLC, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC doing business as Thermal Comfort LLC, Austin W. Luther, IV and Topbuild Home Services, Inc.
Cross Defendant: Sekas Homes, LTD.
Cross Claimant: Collin Sekas and Bryan Deege
Case Number: 1:2023cv00659
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER For the reasons discussed with the parties during the status conference held on November 3, 2023, the stay previously entered concerning plaintiff's claims against the defendants pending the submission of a dismissal order is continued. This includes all discovery related deadlines and any filing deadlines related to plaintiff's claims against defendants. This stay does not alter any action or deadlines related to the crossclaims by defendants.An additional status conference will be set for December 8, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. If a stipulated order of dismissal has been filed relating to plaintiff s claims against the defendants, the status conference will be cancelled.Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/03/2023. (Dcrow, )
November 3, 2023 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Status Conference held on 11/3/2023. Pltf appeared Pro Se. Deft appeared through William Brock. The parties advised the court of the status of the case. Matter continued for a Status Conference. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(Dcrow, )
November 3, 2023 Status Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dcrow, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Scully on behalf of Topbuild Home Services, Inc. (Scully, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2023 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Kirchner on behalf of Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry (Kirchner, Christine)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - For the reasons discussed with the parties, all action in this action concerning plaintiff's claims against the defendants is stayed pending the submission of a dismissal order. This includes all discovery related deadlines and any filing deadlines related to plaintiff's claims against defendants. This order does not stay any action or deadlines related to the crossclaims by defendants. A status conference will be set for November 3, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. If a stipulated order of dismissal has been filed relating to plaintiffs claims against the defendants, the status conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/16/2023. (wgar, )
October 16, 2023 Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, )
October 12, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Settlement Conference held on 10/12/2023 lasted 6 hours, 30 minutes. (Dcrow, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) ConferenceUpon consideration of the representations made in the parties' Joint Proposed Discovery Plan ("Joint Discovery Plan") (Docket no. 86) and at the hearing held on October 4, 2023, the court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by January 12, 2024. Plaintiffs request to extend the discovery period is denied without prejudice. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan is approved in part and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by October 5, 2023. 4. The parties shall not be limited in the number of requests for admissions and requests for production of documents served. 5. Objections to discovery shall be served within fifteen (15) days after service and responses to discovery shall be served within thirty (30) days after service. Plaintiff s request to shorten the time for serving responses to discovery requests is denied. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/04/2023. (Dcrow, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 96 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2023. Plaintiff appeared Pro Se. Deft appeared through counsels William Brock, Daniel Duddy, Alexander Faig and Katherine McKnight. Joint discovery plan was approved in part. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(Dcrow, )
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for issuance of subpoenas duces tecum is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/4/2023. (Sbro)
October 2, 2023 Filing 94 Response to #78 Supplemental Brief in Support filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(swil)
October 2, 2023 Filing 93 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #91 MOTION to Strike by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
October 2, 2023 Filing 92 Memorandum in Support re #91 MOTION to Strike filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
October 2, 2023 Filing 91 MOTION to Strike by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(swil)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDERED that plaintiff file a response to [Dkt. No. 78] within seven (7) days in re #82 Motion for Leave to File Response to the Sekas Defendants' Intentionally Misleading and Improper Supplemental Brief and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/2/2023. (swil)
September 27, 2023 Filing 89 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #87 Application for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Party Entities Sunrise Square Rentals, L.C.; Reston Valley Condominums, L.C. and Mosaic Four Seasons, L.C. by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
September 27, 2023 Filing 88 Memorandum in Support re #87 Application for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Party Entities Sunrise Square Rentals, L.C.; Reston Valley Condominums, L.C. and Mosaic Four Seasons, L.C. filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
September 27, 2023 Filing 87 Application for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Non-Party Entities Sunrise Square Rentals, L.C.; Reston Valley Condominums, L.C. and Mosaic Four Seasons, L.C. by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(swil)
September 27, 2023 Filing 86 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Austin W. Luther, IV, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC.(Duddy, Dannel)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDERED that parties file one paper chambers copy of each future motion, brief, or supporting document with the Clerk's Office within one business day of filling on the CM/ECF system. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/26/2023. (swil)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion [Dkt. No. 79] be and is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/26/2023. (swil)
September 25, 2023 Filing 83 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #82 Motion for Leave to File Response to the Sekas Defendants' Intentionally Misleading and Improper Supplemental Brief and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
September 25, 2023 Filing 82 Motion for Leave to File Response to the Sekas Defendants' Intentionally Misleading and Improper Supplemental Brief and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
September 22, 2023 Filing 81 Supplemental Brief filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(swil)
September 22, 2023 Filing 80 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument in re #79 Unopposed Motion for Order Granting Plaintiff Special Privilege to File Electronically in this Case by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
September 22, 2023 Filing 79 Unopposed Motion for Order Granting Plaintiff Special Privilege to File Electronically in this Case by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(swil)
September 22, 2023 Filing 78 Supplemental Briefing in Support to #56 Reply to Response to Motion, Supplemental Briefing filed by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Brock, William) Modified text to correct event on 9/24/2023 (Dest).
September 22, 2023 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Topbuild Home Services, Inc. by Connor Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Bryan Deege, John P. Sekas, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. to Answer, #2 Exhibit 1. to Cross Claim, #3 Exhibit 2. to Cross Claim)(Brock, William)
September 22, 2023 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Sekas Homes, LTD. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(McKnight, Katherine)
September 22, 2023 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry.(Faig, Alexander)
September 22, 2023 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint by Austin W. Luther, IV, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC.(Duddy, Dannel)
September 22, 2023 Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dcrow, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 1/12/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/11/23. (yguy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2023: #1 mag. Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice) (yguy).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part #43 Motion to Dismiss; denying #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #9 Motion for More Definite Statement (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/8/23. (yguy)
September 8, 2023 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2023. #7 Appearance of Pro Se plaintiff and defendant COUNSEL. Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro, and #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice are argued and #7, #9 are DENIED, #35, #41, #43 ARE GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. (Order to follow) (Court Reporter S. Austin.)(yguy)
September 6, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Collyns Moore on behalf of Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry (Moore, Samuel)
August 23, 2023 Filing 69 Sur-Reply in Response to Untimely Sekas Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
August 23, 2023 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 Motion to Strike Untimely Sekas Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(swil)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED that plaintiff's motion found at [Dkt. No. 63] is GRANTED, and plaintiff's motions found at [Dkt. Nos. 57 and 60] are DENIED. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff promptly file Exhibit 1 to [Dkt. No. 63] as a sur-reply to the Sekas defendant's reply memorandum (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/23/2023. (swil)
August 22, 2023 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re #63 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION to Strike filed by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brock, William)
August 21, 2023 Filing 65 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #63 Motion to Strike Untimely Sekas Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 64 Memorandum in Support re #63 Motion to Strike Untimely Sekas Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 63 Motion to Strike Untimely Sekas Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or Alternatively, Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 62 Notice Waiver of Oral Argument re #60 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Thermal Comfort and Luther's Reply in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 61 Memorandum in Support re #60 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Thermal Comfort and Luther's Reply in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 60 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Thermal Comfort and Luther's Reply in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 59 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #57 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Topbuild's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #57 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Topbuild's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
August 21, 2023 Filing 57 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Response to Topbuild's Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 17, 2023 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice filed by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Home Sales Contract with Exhibits)(Brock, William)
August 16, 2023 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
August 16, 2023 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
August 16, 2023 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Austin W. Luther, IV, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC. (Duddy, Dannel)
August 10, 2023 Filing 52 Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 10, 2023 Filing 51 Opposition to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 10, 2023 Filing 50 Opposition to #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(swil)
August 10, 2023 Filing 49 Opposition to #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
July 31, 2023 Filing 48 Response to #34 NOTICE filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/23. (yguy)
July 31, 2023 Set Deadline as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
July 31, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended complaint with Roseboro, #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice, #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro, Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (yguy)
July 28, 2023 Filing 46 Notice of Hearing Date re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. (Faig, Alexander)
July 28, 2023 Set Deadline as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
July 28, 2023 Notice of Correction re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro. Unfortunately the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest)
July 27, 2023 Filing 45 Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/01/2023 re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. (McKnight, Katherine)
July 27, 2023 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
July 27, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice to Pro Se Litigant "Roseboro Notice", #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKnight, Katherine)
July 27, 2023 Filing 42 Memorandum in Support re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
July 27, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint with Roseboro,. by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
July 27, 2023 Filing 40 Notice Waiver of Oral Argument in re #39 Motion for Leave to Respond to Notice that Defendants Intend to Proceed With Their Previously Filed Motions by Robert A. Caplen (swil)
July 27, 2023 Filing 39 Motion for Leave to Respond to Notice that Defendants Intend to Proceed With Their Previously Filed Motions by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(swil)
July 27, 2023 Filing 38 Filed in error and removed(swil).
July 27, 2023 Filing 37 Opposition to #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice filed by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
July 27, 2023 Notice of Correction re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro. Unfortunately, the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest)
July 26, 2023 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, filed by Austin W. Luther, IV, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC. (Duddy, Dannel)
July 26, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Austin W. Luther, IV, Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC. (Duddy, Dannel)
July 26, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice (Brock, William)
July 13, 2023 Filing 33 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air Control, LLC, Bryan Deege, Frederick Lowry, Austin W. Luther, IV, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC, Topbuild Home Services, Inc., filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(swil)
July 7, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry Change in Law Firm Name and Contact Information (Faig, Alexander)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that the Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 25] be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff has leave to file a second amended complaint within 14 days that properly complies with the requirements of Rule 8; and it is further ORDERED that, within 14 days of plaintiff filing a second amended complaint, defendants either file new responsive pleadings or advise the Court that they intend to proceed with their previously filed motions (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/5/2023. (swil)
June 30, 2023 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air Control, LLC, Bryan Deege, Frederick Lowry, Austin W. Luther, IV, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC, Topbuild Home Services, Inc., filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(swil)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that the defendants Thermal Comfort and Austin Luther, IV file a responsive pleading to the Complaint by July 3, 2023 in re #23 Motion to Set Aside Default (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/27/2023. (swil)
June 22, 2023 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument in re #23 MOTION to Set Aside Default And For Extension To File Responsive Pleadings. (jlan)
June 21, 2023 Set Deadline as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 28 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
June 20, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Hearing Date August 4, 2023 re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Faig, Alexander)
June 20, 2023 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
June 20, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Air Control, LLC, Frederick Lowry. (Faig, Alexander)
June 20, 2023 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Set Aside Default And For Extension To File Responsive Pleadings filed by Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC. (Duddy, Dannel)
June 20, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Set Aside Default And For Extension To File Responsive Pleadings by Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duddy, Dannel)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Christine Kennedy for Topbuild Home Services, Inc. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/16/2023. (swil)
June 16, 2023 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christine Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine L. McKnight Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8986265. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 16, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing Date re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice (Brock, William)
June 16, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
June 16, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro., #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Fornaciari for Topbuild Home Services, Inc. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/15/2023. (swil)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Pro hac vice Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/15/2023. (swil) Modified to correct docket text on 6/16/2023 (swil).
June 15, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 4, 2023 re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 15, 2023 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 15, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Roseboro Notice)(McKnight, Katherine)
June 15, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Fornaciari and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine L. McKnight Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8984172. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 15, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christine Kennedy and Certification of Local Counsel Katherine L. McKnight Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8984140. by Topbuild Home Services, Inc.. (McKnight, Katherine)
June 15, 2023 Filing 12 [VACATED per ECF 29] Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC (Sbro) (Main Document 12 replaced on 6/15/2023) (Sbro, ). Modified on 6/27/2023 (swil).
June 15, 2023 Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice. The filing user has been notified to file a notice of hearing or waiver of oral argument. (Sbro)
June 14, 2023 Filing 11 Request for Entry of Default as to Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sbro)
June 14, 2023 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice filed by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Brock, William)
June 14, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Roseboro Notice by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Brock, William)
June 14, 2023 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Brock, William)
June 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Bryan Deege, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD.. (Brock, William)
June 5, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Air Control, LLC served on 5/30/2023, answer due 6/20/2023; Frederick Lowry served on 5/27/2023, answer due 6/20/2023; Austin W. Luther, IV served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023 (swil)
May 30, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert A. Caplen. Bryan Deege served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; Reston Valley, L.C. served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; Collin Sekas served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; Connor Sekas served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; John P. Sekas served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; Sekas Homes, LTD. served on 5/24/2023, answer due 6/14/2023; Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023; Topbuild Home Services, Inc. served on 5/25/2023, answer due 6/15/2023 (swil)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/22/2023. (swil)
May 19, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Robert A. Caplen. (swil)
May 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued to be served by SPS as to Air Control, LLC, Bryan Deege, Frederick Lowry, Austin W. Luther, IV, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC, Topbuild Home Services, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Air Control, LLC, Bryan Deege, Frederick Lowry, Austin W. Luther, IV, Reston Valley, L.C., Collin Sekas, Connor Sekas, John P. Sekas, Sekas Homes, LTD., Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC, Topbuild Home Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 100002296.), filed by Robert A. Caplen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Civil Cover Sheet, #25 Receipt)(swil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caplen v. Sekas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Caplen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. Sekas
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reston Valley, L.C.
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connor Sekas
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Lowry
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Faig
Represented By: Samuel Collyns Moore
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Control, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Faig
Represented By: Samuel Collyns Moore
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermal Comfort Heating & Air, LLC doing business as Thermal Comfort LLC
Represented By: Dannel Charles Duddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin W. Luther, IV
Represented By: Dannel Charles Duddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topbuild Home Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Kennedy
Represented By: John Fornaciari
Represented By: Katherine Lea McKnight
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Sekas Homes, LTD.
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Collin Sekas
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Bryan Deege
Represented By: William Wirt Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?