Knockout Holdings, LLC v. Kakar
Plaintiff: Knockout Holdings, LLC and Octo Platform Equity Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Arvinder Kakar
Case Number: 1:2023cv00944
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 9/14/2023. (tran) (Main Document 26 replaced on 9/14/2023) (tran, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2023: #1 Exhibit A) (tran, ).
September 13, 2023 Filing 25 Opposition to #23 Response to Motion filed by Arvinder Kakar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sims, Charles)
September 12, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
September 8, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Reply Memorandum filed by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
September 5, 2023 Filing 22 Sealed Exhibit 1 re #17 Reply to Response to Motion. (nneb)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Kakar's #19 Motion to Seal and, ORDERS that Exhibit 1 to the Reply Brief be filed under seal and maintained under seal until further order of this Court (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 09/05/23. (pmil, )
September 1, 2023 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Reply Memorandum filed by Arvinder Kakar. (Sims, Charles)
September 1, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Reply Memorandum by Arvinder Kakar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sims, Charles)
September 1, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Arvinder Kakar re #17 Reply to Response to Motion (Sims, Charles)
September 1, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint filed by Arvinder Kakar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal))(Sims, Charles)
August 28, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Settlement Conference held on 8/28/2023. Appearance of counsel. Case did not settle. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 16 Opposition to #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint filed by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
August 21, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference reset for 8/28/2023 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
August 7, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 8/28/2023 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 28, 2023, to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including September 8, 2023, to file a reply brief to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hear Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on September 22, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 08/03/2023. (dvanm)
August 2, 2023 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werner, Paul)
August 2, 2023 Set Deadline as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
August 1, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/22/2023 at 10:00 am re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint (Sims, Charles)
August 1, 2023 Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint. Unfortunately, the motion was filed without a Notice of Hearing Date. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date, or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (Dest)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint filed by Arvinder Kakar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Sims, Charles)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Counts II and III of the Complaint by Arvinder Kakar. (Sims, Charles)
July 28, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION For Joint Request For Mediation by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
July 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Imad Sayed Matini on behalf of Knockout Holdings, LLC (Matini, Imad)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Arvinder Kakar, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(show)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Charles Sims and Paul Werner Acknowledgement filed by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Quinn Adams on behalf of Arvinder Kakar (Adams, Christopher)
July 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Luzietti Loughlin on behalf of Arvinder Kakar (Loughlin, Rachael)
July 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Michael Sims on behalf of Arvinder Kakar (Sims, Charles)
July 18, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (show)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Arvinder Kakar by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
July 18, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against Arvinder Kakar ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9032625.), filed by Knockout Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Werner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knockout Holdings, LLC v. Kakar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knockout Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Werner, III
Represented By: Imad Sayed Matini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octo Platform Equity Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Werner, III
Represented By: Imad Sayed Matini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinder Kakar
Represented By: Charles Michael Sims
Represented By: Christopher Quinn Adams
Represented By: Rachael Luzietti Loughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?