Lowy v. Daniel Defense, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Karen Lowy
Defendant: Daniel Defense, LLC, FAB Defense, Inc., FAB Manufacturing & Import of Industrial Equipment Ltd., Bravo Company USA, Inc., Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC, FOSTECH, Inc., Hearing Protection, LLC, Centurion Arms, LLC, Magpul Industries Corp., Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc., Fiocchi of America, Inc., Fiocchi Munizioni S.p.A., Starline, Inc., Surefire, LLC, Torkmag, Inc. and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv01338
Filed: October 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 123 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Jones and Certification of Local Counsel Nancy J. Goodiel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9240815. by Hearing Protection, LLC, Torkmag, Inc.. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition, Extend Deadline, and Extend Page Limit is DENIED and ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension and Coordinated Briefing Schedule for Defendant Daniel Defense's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/28/23. (tfitz, )
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nicholas Paul Vari for Fiocchi of America, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/27/2023. (swil)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED as premature because no scheduling order has been issued in this case, and discovery has not yet been authorized in re #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/27/2023. (swil)
November 27, 2023 Filing 119 Waiver of re #116 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition, Extend Deadline, and Extend Page Limit / Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition, Extend Deadline, and Extend Page Limit by Karen Lowy (Ali, Kathryn)
November 26, 2023 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument in re #116 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition, Extend Deadline, and Extend Page Limit. (jlan)
November 22, 2023 Filing 118 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Renzulli and Certification of Local Counsel Nancy J. Goodiel Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9233236. by Hearing Protection, LLC, Torkmag, Inc.. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 117 Consent MOTION for Extension and Coordinated Briefing Schedule for Defendant Daniel Defense's Motion to Dismiss by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to File Omnibus Opposition, Extend Deadline, and Extend Page Limit by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn)
November 20, 2023 Filing 115 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Rockwell Rudd and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Bowen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9229201. by Centurion Arms, LLC, Daniel Defense, LLC, FOSTECH, Inc., Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 20, 2023 Filing 114 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Lloyd Braum and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Bowen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9229164. by Centurion Arms, LLC, Daniel Defense, LLC, FOSTECH, Inc., Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 17, 2023 Filing 113 NOTICE of Joinder in Def Joint Motion for a Stay Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Defense, LLC re #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss (Bowen, David) Modified to correct docket text on 11/20/2023 (Sbro).
November 17, 2023 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss. (wgar, )
November 17, 2023 Set Deadline as to #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
November 17, 2023 Set Deadline as to #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (wgar, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 112 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/19/2024 re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bowen, David)
November 16, 2023 Filing 111 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Daniel Defense, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 16, 2023 Filing 110 Memorandum in Support re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Defense, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 16, 2023 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Daniel Defense, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Alan Walter Nicgorski for Bravo Company USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/16/2023. (swil)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jeremy Adelson for Bravo Company USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/16/2023. (swil)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Camden Robert Webb for Bravo Company USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/16/2023. (swil)
November 16, 2023 Set Deadline as to #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Kelley on behalf of FAB Defense, Inc. (Kelley, Emily)
November 15, 2023 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Abram John Pafford on behalf of FAB Defense, Inc. (Pafford, Abram)
November 15, 2023 Filing 103 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 19, 2024 re #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss (Haynes, Meredith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 102 Memorandum in Support re #101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss filed by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (Haynes, Meredith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (Haynes, Meredith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 100 Notice of Hearing Date set for 01/19/2024 re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bowen, David)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Andrew Arthur Lothson for Federal Cartridge Company,Andrew Arthur Lothson for Vista Outdoor, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/15/2023. (swil)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Brian Vogts for Federal Cartridge Company,James Brian Vogts for Vista Outdoor, Inc. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/15/2023. (swil)
November 15, 2023 Filing 97 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fiocchi of America, Inc.. (Cook, Andrew)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 So Ordered re #60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Starline, Inc. Only. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/15/2023. (Sbro)
November 15, 2023 Filing 95 Notice of Hearing Date re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Cook, Andrew)
November 15, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #81 MOTION to Dismiss, #79 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
November 15, 2023 Notice of Correction: Filing users notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Waiver of Oral Argument re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and to file memorandum in support separate from motion re #74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, (Sbro)
November 14, 2023 Filing 94 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Surefire, LLC. (Weitzner, Michael)
November 14, 2023 Filing 93 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 14, 2023 Filing 92 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FOSTECH, Inc.. (Bowen, David)
November 14, 2023 Filing 91 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Centurion Arms, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 14, 2023 Filing 90 MOTION for Disclosure Financial Disclosure Statement by Centurion Arms, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 14, 2023 Filing 89 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/19/2024 re #81 MOTION to Dismiss (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 14, 2023 Filing 88 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/19/2024 re #79 MOTION to Dismiss (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 14, 2023 Filing 87 Memorandum in Support re #79 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hearing Protection, LLC. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 14, 2023 Set Deadline as to #83 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 86 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Magpul Industries Corp.. (Weitzner, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 19, 2024 re #83 MOTION to Dismiss (Weitzner, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 84 Memorandum in Support re #83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Magpul Industries Corp., Surefire, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weitzner, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss by Magpul Industries Corp., Surefire, LLC. (Weitzner, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Filing 82 Memorandum in Support re #81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Torkmag, Inc.. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss by Torkmag, Inc.. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 80 Memorandum in Support re #79 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hearing Protection, LLC. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss by Hearing Protection, LLC. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 78 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Torkmag, Inc.. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 77 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hearing Protection, LLC. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Joan Goodiel on behalf of Hearing Protection, LLC, Torkmag, Inc. (Goodiel, Nancy)
November 13, 2023 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fiocchi of America, Inc.. (Cook, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Fiocchi of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Hearing)(Cook, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Filing 73 Memorandum in Support re #72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Centurion Arms, LLC, FOSTECH, Inc., Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 13, 2023 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Centurion Arms, LLC, FOSTECH, Inc., Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC. (Bowen, David)
November 13, 2023 Filing 71 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas P. Vari and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew N. Cook Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9215483. by Fiocchi of America, Inc.. (Cook, Andrew)
November 13, 2023 Set Deadline as to #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
November 10, 2023 Filing 70 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Arthur Lothson and Certification of Local Counsel Alan D. Bart Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9214096. by Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc.. (Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 69 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Brian Vogts and Certification of Local Counsel Alan D. Bart Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9214092. by Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc.. (Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 68 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc.. (Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 67 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 19, 2024 re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 66 Memorandum in Support re #65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Ehrich Declaration))(Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Federal Cartridge Company, Vista Outdoor, Inc.. (Bart, Alan)
November 10, 2023 Filing 64 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (Haynes, Meredith)
November 10, 2023 Filing 63 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 19, 2024 re #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim (Haynes, Meredith)
November 10, 2023 Filing 62 Memorandum in Support re #61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (Haynes, Meredith)
November 10, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (Haynes, Meredith)
November 9, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Starline, Inc. Only by Karen Lowy (Ali, Kathryn)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant FAB Defense, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than December 6, 2023 re #58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/9/2023. (Sbro)
November 8, 2023 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time_FAB Defense, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ali, Kathryn)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 11/2/2023. (swil)
October 31, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Lockwood by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn)
October 31, 2023 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice by Karen Lowy. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9196976.. (Ali, Kathryn)
October 30, 2023 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Daniel Defense, LLC served on 10/27/2023, answer due 11/17/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John D. Ohlendorf for Surefire, LLC. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/27/2023. (swil)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Brian Wesley Barnes for Surefire, LLC. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/27/2023. (swil)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David H. Thompson for Surefire, LLC. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/27/2023. (swil)
October 26, 2023 Filing 51 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Walter Nicgorski and Certification of Local Counsel Charles E. James, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9189029. by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (James, Charles)
October 26, 2023 Filing 50 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Adelson and Certification of Local Counsel Charles E. James, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9189021. by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (James, Charles)
October 26, 2023 Filing 49 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Camden Robert Webb and Certification of Local Counsel Charles E. James, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9189012. by Bravo Company USA, Inc.. (James, Charles)
October 26, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. James, Jr on behalf of Bravo Company USA, Inc. (James, Charles)
October 25, 2023 Filing 47 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Ohlendorf and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9187820. by Surefire, LLC. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 25, 2023 Filing 46 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Barnes and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9187803. by Surefire, LLC. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 25, 2023 Filing 45 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Thompson and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9187732. by Surefire, LLC. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 25, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Weitzner on behalf of Surefire, LLC (Weitzner, Michael)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Responsive Pleadings to Accommodate Coordinated Briefing Schedule (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/25/2023. (swil)
October 24, 2023 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Responsive Pleadings to Accommodate Coordinated Briefing Schedule by Karen Lowy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ali, Kathryn)
October 24, 2023 Filing 41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Halladay White Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel R. Michael Trumble Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9185905. by Starline, Inc.. (Trumble, Robert)
October 24, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Michael Trumble on behalf of Starline, Inc. (Trumble, Robert)
October 24, 2023 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Torkmag, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 24, 2023 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Hearing Protection, LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 23, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Macdonald Haynes on behalf of Bravo Company USA, Inc. (Haynes, Meredith)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John D. Ohlendorf for Magpul Industries Corp. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/23/2023. (swil)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Brian Wesley Barnes for Magpul Industries Corp. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/23/2023. (swil)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David H. Thompson for Magpul Industries Corp. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/23/2023. (swil)
October 19, 2023 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Vista Outdoor, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Surefire, LLC served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Starline, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Magpul Industries Corp. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy FOSTECH, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Fiocchi of America, Inc. served on 10/7/2023, answer due 10/30/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Federal Cartridge Company served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy FAB Defense, Inc. served on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Centurion Arms, LLC served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 19, 2023 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Lowy Bravo Company USA, Inc. served on 10/6/2023, answer due 10/27/2023 (Ali, Kathryn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Ohlendorf and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9176957. by Magpul Industries Corp.. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 18, 2023 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian W. Barnes and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9176943. by Magpul Industries Corp.. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 18, 2023 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Thompson and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Weitzner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9176911. by Magpul Industries Corp.. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Weitzner on behalf of Magpul Industries Corp. (Weitzner, Michael)
October 2, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Bravo Company USA, Inc., Centurion Arms, LLC, Daniel Defense, LLC, FAB Defense, Inc., FAB Manufacturing & Import of Industrial Equipment Ltd., FOSTECH, Inc., Federal Cartridge Company, Fiocchi Munizioni S.p.A., Fiocchi of America, Inc., Hearing Protection, LLC, Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC, Magpul Industries Corp., Starline, Inc., Surefire, LLC, Torkmag, Inc., Vista Outdoor, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney) (Sbro)
October 1, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Sbro)
October 1, 2023 Filing 17 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Torkmag, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 17 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 16 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Surefire, LLC by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 16 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Starline, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 15 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Fiocchi Munizioni S.p.A. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 14 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 13 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Fiocchi of America, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 13 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Vista Outdoor, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 12 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Federal Cartridge Company by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 11 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Magpul Industries Corp. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 10 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Centurion Arms, LLC by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 9 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Hearing Protection, LLC by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 8 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to FOSTECH, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 7 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 6 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Bravo Company USA, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 5 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to FAB Manufacturing & Import of Industrial Equipment Ltd. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 4 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to FAB Defense, Inc. by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint as to Daniel Defense, LLC by Karen Lowy. (Ali, Kathryn) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 10/2/2023) (Sbro).
October 1, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9151404.), filed by Karen Lowy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ali, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowy v. Daniel Defense, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lowy
Represented By: Kathryn Marshall Ali
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Defense, LLC
Represented By: David Charles Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAB Defense, Inc.
Represented By: Abram John Pafford
Represented By: Emily Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAB Manufacturing & Import of Industrial Equipment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravo Company USA, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Walter Nicgorski
Represented By: Camden Robert Webb
Represented By: Charles E. James, Jr.
Represented By: Jeremy Adelson
Represented By: Meredith Macdonald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loyal 9 Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: David Charles Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTECH, Inc.
Represented By: David Charles Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearing Protection, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Joan Goodiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Arms, LLC
Represented By: David Charles Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magpul Industries Corp.
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Represented By: Michael Weitzner
Represented By: Brian Wesley Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Cartridge Company
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bart
Represented By: Andrew Arthur Lothson
Represented By: James Brian Vogts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bart
Represented By: Andrew Arthur Lothson
Represented By: James Brian Vogts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiocchi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew North Cook
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Vari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiocchi Munizioni S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starline, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Michael Trumble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surefire, LLC
Represented By: Michael Weitzner
Represented By: Brian Wesley Barnes
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: John D. Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torkmag, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Joan Goodiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?