Behnam v. Faheem et al
Plaintiff: Lida Behnam and Lida Behnam doing business as Lida Travel(s)
Defendant: Tamana Faheem, Lailuma Faheem, Arzoo Faheem, Abdul Khabeer Faheem and John Does 1-14
Case Number: 1:2023cv01416
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than January 12, 2024. It is further ORDERED Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Second Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt. No. 17] is GRANTED. Defendants' Second Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt. No. 15] is deemed withdrawn. It is further ORDERED that no further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/8/2023. (swil)
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension by Abdul Khabeer Faheem, Lailuma Faheem, Tamana Faheem. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Faig, Alexander)
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Phillip Faig on behalf of Abdul Khabeer Faheem, Lailuma Faheem, Tamana Faheem (Faig, Alexander)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 Withdrawal of Motion by Abdul Khabeer Faheem, Lailuma Faheem, Tamana Faheem re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Faig, Alexander)
November 28, 2023 Notice of Correction re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (swil)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/27/2023. (swil)
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lailuma Faheem. (swil)
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Lailuma Faheem. (swil)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that the Motion #12 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended to December 8, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/15/2023. (Dcrow, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 Request for Extension of Court Date by Abdul Khabeer Faheem. (swil)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lida Behnam Tamana Faheem served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023 (Powers, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lida Behnam Lailuma Faheem served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023 (Powers, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lida Behnam Arzoo Faheem served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023 (Powers, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lida Behnam (Powers, Robert)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lida Behnam Abdul Khabeer Faheem served on 10/26/2023, answer due 11/16/2023 (Powers, Robert)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Abdul Khabeer Faheem, Arzoo Faheem, Lailuma Faheem, Tamana Faheem, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Summons Notice)(swil)
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, ABDUL KHABEER FAHEEM by Lida Behnam. (Powers, Robert)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, LAILUMA FAHEEM by Lida Behnam. (Powers, Robert)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, ARZOO FAHEEM by Lida Behnam. (Powers, Robert)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, TAMANA FAHEEM by Lida Behnam. (Powers, Robert)
October 19, 2023 No service issued at this time. (swil)
October 18, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9175843.), filed by Lida Behnam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Errata G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Powers, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Behnam v. Faheem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lida Behnam
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lida Behnam doing business as Lida Travel(s)
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamana Faheem
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Faig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lailuma Faheem
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Faig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arzoo Faheem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Khabeer Faheem
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Faig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?