County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: County Board of Arlington County, Virginia
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Evernorth Health, Inc. (Formerly Express Scripts Holding Company), Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, MEDCO Health Solutions, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc. and OptumInsight, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01504
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 2:23-cv-22776, filed 11/30/2023. (jlan)
November 30, 2023 Case electronically transferred to The District of New Jersey per Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-6) of the MDL Panel 3080. (jlan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 21 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) of the MDL Panel 3080 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation. Case transferred to District of New Jersey and assigned to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete, Clerk of the Panel on 11/28/2023. (jlan) (jlan)
November 8, 2023 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 19 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Optum, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 8, 2023 Case Reassigned to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (dvanm)
November 6, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
November 6, 2023 Filing 18 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint UnitedHealth Group, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint OptumRx Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 15 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint OptumInsight, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Novo Nordisk, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Medco Health Solutions, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Express Scripts, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Express Scripts Administrators, LLC by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Evernorth Health formerly Express Scripts Holding Company by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Eli Lilly and Company by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint CVS Health Corporation by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Caremark, LLC by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Caremark Rx, LLC by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Caremark PCS Health, LLC by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Spivey, William)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9205781.), filed by County Board of Arlington County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spivey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County Board of Arlington County, Virginia v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County Board of Arlington County, Virginia
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc. (Formerly Express Scripts Holding Company)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDCO Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?