Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC v. The Partnerships, etc.
Plaintiff: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2023cv01560
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheets, Kendal)
January 12, 2024 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2024. Kendal Sheets and Joseph Zito appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Matter is uncontested. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #29 GRANTED. Parties required to file a status with regard to defendants as stated in open court. Order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Salters.) (lcre, )
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 40, Sephora Sister (Amazon Merchant ID ANYU5TKS68I4V), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #45 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/10/2024. (lcre, )
January 9, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 40 Sephora Sister by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 6, Mlystore (Amazon Merchant ID A1OEYF8N2OLUXN), and Defendant No. 16, Viral_Products (Amazon Merchant ID A2MVFKWU07XBGJ), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/8/2024. (swil)
January 8, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 16 Viral_Products by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 7, 2024 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 6 Mlystore by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 5, 2024 Filing 41 NOTICE by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC re #37 MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO as to Defendant No. 11 HUMO for Waiver of Hearing (Sheets, Kendal)
January 5, 2024 Notice of Correction re #37 MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO as to Defendant No. 11 HUMO. Filing user has been notified to file Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument separately (swil)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 48, hui liao (Amazon Merchant ID A38ABl3IG3TN07), and Defendant No. 49, wu xiao mi (Amazon Merchant ID A22AONV7LQBAMI), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/4/2024. (swil)
January 3, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 49 wu xiao mi by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 48 hui liao by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO as to Defendant No. 11 HUMO by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 36, Leather Native (Amazon Merchant ID AAJSDMD5GWIPR) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #35 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/3/2024. (swil)
December 30, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 36 Leather Native by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 42, Kaymer (Amazon Merchant ID AZ1KND1LY7SZ1) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 42 Kaymer. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/29/2023. (Dest)
December 27, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 42 Kaymer by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 22, 2023 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Service re #28 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 22, 2023 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service re #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #30 Memorandum in Support, by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 21, 2023 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Schedule A, #2 Exhibit B - Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Chart)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 21, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 20, 2023 Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction Scheduling Order (Dkt. 26) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is furtherORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary injunction no later than December 21, 2023, Defendants may file an opposition no later than January 4, 2024, and Plaintiff may file any reply no later than January 9, 2024. The Court will hear argument on the motion for preliminary injunction on January 12, 2024.It is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 11) shall be extended until Wednesday, January 3, 2024, at 5:00 P.M. Plaintiff may move for a further extension through the preliminary injunction hearing prior to this expiration date if there is good cause. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/20/2023. (Dcrow, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION Scheduling for Preliminary Injunction Briefing re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - e-mails, #2 Exhibit B - Chart)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 19, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION Scheduling for Preliminary Injunction Briefing re #20 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 37, Total Eco Sales (Amazon Merchant ID AC3613L1NMB7B), Defendant No. 20, Toor Ltd. (Amazon Merchant ID A2XU8HH2J0SJCC), Defendant No. 23, Sabrezzi Home (Amazon Merchant IDA34JS9RLLQ64CO), Defendant No. 26, HomeWetBar Gifts (Amazon Merchant IDA39KJABNXR68CO), and Defendant No. 25, Zephan-US (Amazon Merchant ID A36P2UABEJO5JB), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 11) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 37, Total Eco Sales, Defendant No. 20, Toor Ltd, Defendant No. 23, Sabrezzi Home, Defendant No. 26, HomeWetBar Gifts, and Defendant No. 25, Zephan-US in re #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/18/2023. (swil)
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 23 Sabrezzi Home by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 26 HomeWetBar Gifts by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 25 Zephan-US by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant 37 Total Eco Sales by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Partially Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 18) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 11) is hereby DISSOLVED as to Defendant No. 1, Upper Midland Products, and that Amazon.com shall immediately release the following account associated with that seller: Merchant ID: A124EDGJHR3S3V; AMZ_ASIN: B0B4T5W87K; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 11) against the remaining Defendants shall be extended until, and will expire absent further good cause shown on, Wednesday, December 20, 2023, at 5:00 P.M (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/15/2023. (swil)
December 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 20 Toor Ltd by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 15, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Partially Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC re #15 Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order for Waiver of Hearing (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service re #15 Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kendal Sheets)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(a)(i), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 30, Alphra International (Amazon Merchant ID A3K8ZPZ18JES2) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/11/2023. (swil)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED that the Motion for TRO re #6 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Amazon.com shall freeze all accounts associated with Defendants identified in Schedule A attached to the complaint and prohibit the transfer of any monies held in such accounts. ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve limited discovery on Amazon.com sufficient to discover the amounts of any monies held by Amazon.com in association with Defendants identified in Schedule A as well as any name, email address, address, telephone number, and bank account associated with such Amazon.com account(s). ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve the complaint upon Defendants using the email addresses determined during the course of limited discovery. ORDERED that any information disclosed to Plaintiff in response to discovery issued pursuant to this Order may be used solely for the purpose of protecting Plaintiff's rights as set forth in the complaint. ORDERED that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 65(b)(2) this Temporary Restraining Order will expire on December 15, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/1/2023. (lcre, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff: Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2023. Appearances of counsel. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #6 argued and GRANTED. Motion Granted with regard to all defendants in both cases.TRO expires on 12/15/23. Parties directed to confer and submit joint briefing schedule. Motion with regard to discovery and service of email GRANTED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Salters.)(lcre, )
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Joseph J Zito for Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 11/29/2023. (swil)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
November 29, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Zito and Certification of Local Counsel Kendal Sheets Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9238025. by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/01/2023 re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sheets, Kendal)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action. (jlan)
November 22, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (jlan)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sheets, Kendal)(jlan)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal) (jlan)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9223877.), filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Schedule A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sheets, Kendal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC v. The Partnerships, etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC
Represented By: Joseph J Zito
Represented By: Kendal Meredith Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?