Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC v. The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, Digital Distillery LLC and Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize)
Case Number: 1:2023cv01563
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 129 STATUS REPORT by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheets, Kendal)
January 12, 2024 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff: Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 1/12/2024. Kendal Sheets and Joseph Zito appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Matter is uncontested. Parties required to file a status with regard to defendants as stated in open court. Order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Salters.)(lcre, )
January 12, 2024 Set Deadline as to #124 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel for Defendant No. 19 OGERY DIRECT (Amazon Merchant ID A1GRYX679EXF26). Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (wgar, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 127 Notice of Hearing Date set for February 9th, 2024 re #124 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel for Defendant No. 19 OGERY DIRECT (Amazon Merchant ID A1GRYX679EXF26) (Sun, Hyung Gyu)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/11/2024. (Sbro)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 46, vernilla (Amazon Merchant ID A23RJ7A8WP75OA), and Defendant No. 51, AZBestPro (Amazon Merchant ID A259PA9KZJB8SO) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #119 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #121 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/10/2024. (Sbro)
January 10, 2024 Filing 124 MOTION to Withdraw Counsel for Defendant No. 19 OGERY DIRECT (Amazon Merchant ID A1GRYX679EXF26) by The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sun, Hyung Gyu)
January 10, 2024 Filing 123 Motion for use of Courtroom Technology for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
January 10, 2024 Filing 122 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 121 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 51 AZBestPro by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 74, Hanstar (Amazon Merchant ID A2QGGKM87OVE6G), Defendant No. 8, Klixa (Amazon Merchant ID A16PW7JODXLU7P), Defendant No. 93, peakeep (Amazon Merchant ID A32EH75LJ11UPE), Defendant No. 92, K&T Products (Amazon Merchant ID A325TY89740GP4), Defendant No. 69, MUSEWISH (Amazon Merchant ID A2M5KL2SZ3JFXK), Defendant No. 32, ONU MALL (Amazon Merchant ID A1V91UUOS08W68), Defendant No. 152, XIAOXINCHAO (Amazon Merchant ID AV8KDHI9VW70K), Defendant No. 129, zhizhixin01 (Amazon Merchant ID A7XKJVFGPQIVW), Defendant No. 108, Bourbon Haze (Amazon Merchant ID A3EV1BTQ09AYMF), Defendant No. 29, Simpsons Sellers (Amazon Merchant ID A1PCJY1L70U4ZS), and Defendant No. 12, The Royal Grous (Amazon Merchant ID A17L2EXH7R5YTU) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #108 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 74 Hanstar, #109 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 8 Klixa, #110 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 93 peakeep, #111 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 92 K&T Products, #112 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 69 MUSEWISH, #113 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 32 ONU MALL, #114 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 152 XIAOXINCHAO, #115 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 129 zhizhixin01, #116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 108 Bourbon Haze, #117 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 29 Simpsons Sellers, #118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 12 The Royal Grous. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/8/2024. (Sbro)
January 8, 2024 Filing 119 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 46 vernilla by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 12 The Royal Grous by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 117 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 29 Simpsons Sellers by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 108 Bourbon Haze by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 115 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 129 zhizhixin01 by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 114 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 152 XIAOXINCHAO by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 113 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 32 ONU MALL by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 112 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 69 MUSEWISH by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 111 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 92 K&T Products by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 8, 2024 Filing 110 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 93 peakeep by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 7, 2024 Filing 109 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 8 Klixa by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 7, 2024 Filing 108 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 74 Hanstar by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 136, KidNest (Amazon Merchant ID AH3SXMUZAY5LU), Defendant No. 42, coateds (Amazon Merchant ID A22VLBI6WDARG 1 ), Defendant No. 22 RS Libations (Amazon Merchant ID A1KUP2KL6H95WC), and Defendant No. 137 YIYUN CO., LTD (Amazon Merchant ID AI-I9S7DPGU1621), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #101 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #99 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #100 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC, #102 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 1/4/2024. (swil)
January 4, 2024 Set Deadline as to #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (wgar, )
January 3, 2024 Filing 106 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 26, 2024 re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process (Reilly, Craig)
January 3, 2024 Filing 105 Declaration re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Reilly, Craig)
January 3, 2024 Filing 104 Memorandum in Support re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process filed by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Reilly, Craig)
January 3, 2024 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Insufficient Service of Process by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
January 3, 2024 Filing 102 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 137 YIYUN CO.,LTD by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 101 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 22 RS Libations by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 42 coateds by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 136 KidNest by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Filing 98 MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO as to Defendant No. 47 Mood Elevation by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER, upon consideration of Pltf's #90 , #91 , #92 , #94 , #95 , #96 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Pltf's claims against Defendant No. 160, One Charm Thing (Amazon Merchant ID AZQ9AD0178Q0J), Defendant No. 58 Rony Express LLC (Amazon Merchant ID A2FLHMTEX8BJZL), Defendant No. 91 EnnovaTools (Amazon Merchant ID A31D2GC8R52NUS), Defendant No. 144 Smoktail (Amazon Merchant ID AMX8V5LCTI7PC), Defendant No. 80, AberdeenOak (Amazon Merchant ID A2VJ5I91TKP9SJ), and Defendant No. 150 Ziissup (Amazon Merchant ID AUARG77DAOPRO) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to the above-listed Defendants. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 01/03/24. (pmil, )
December 30, 2023 Filing 96 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 150 Ziissup by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 30, 2023 Filing 95 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 80 AberdeenOak by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 30, 2023 Filing 94 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 144, Smoktail by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 3, Hohez (Amazon Merchant ID A113WYBFPST3MZ) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 3, Hohez in re #86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 3 Hohez. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/29/2023. (Dest)
December 29, 2023 Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 91 EnnovaTools by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 29, 2023 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 58 Rony Express LLC by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 29, 2023 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 160, One Charm Thing by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 28, 2023 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 8:23-cv-02976, filed 12/28/2023. (jlan)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #71 MOTION Partial dissolve of TRO and Partial Transfer. 1. The Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is hereby DISSOLVED as against Defendant Higher Order Smokers (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/27/2023. (Dest)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER in re Plaintiff's Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (Dkt. 77, 79, 80, 81, 82, 83, 84) pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(a)(i), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 1, Left Click Distribution LLC (Amazon Merchant ID A10PABF17OTZYU), Defendant No. 70, SIMPL CO (Amazon Merchant ID A2ME111CJPMLBF), Defendant No. 52, Brewise (Amazon Merchant ID A25K29JBJI7IOE), Defendant No. 18, Sea Gear (Amazon Merchant ID A1GQ7OVIMNSG09), Defendant No. 114 Gloriser Store (Amazon Merchant ID A3L787JAS80GZG), Defendant No. 64 giftinabox (Amazon Merchant ID A2JOAUTUFKKHSI), and Defendant No. 81 Pro-Online (Amazon Merchant ID A2VQ7PD3QF4SO2) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to the above-listed Defendants. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/27/2023. (Dest)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDERED that the motion (Dkt. 85) is GRANTED, and the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14, as extended at Dkt. 62) is hereby DISSOLVED as against Defendant No. 59, GSWK; and it is further ORDERED that relief sought against Defendant No. 59, GSWK, in Plaintiff's pending motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. 66) is withdrawn; and it is further ORDERED that Amazon.com shall immediately release the following account: AMZ_ASINB09YHZY999, AMZ_MERCHANT_IDA2GD7MKVHWT8B7, SELLERKOVIZE; and it is further ORDERED that except as modified herein, the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14, as extended at Dkt. 62) remains in full force and effect until January 3, 2024; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant No. 59's Motion to Partially Dissolve TRO (Dkt. 73) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/27/2023. (Dest, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 3 Hohez by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 27, 2023 Filing 85 Joint MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, #14 Order,,,, by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 27, 2023 Filing 84 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 81 Pro-Online by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 27, 2023 Case transferred (as to defendant Higher Order Smokers) to the US District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Case file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Dest)
December 23, 2023 Filing 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 64 giftinabox by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 114 Gloriser Store by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 18 Sea Gear by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 80 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 52 Brewise by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 79 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 70 SIMPL CO by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 78 Request for Hearing by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize) re #73 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, (Reilly, Craig)
December 23, 2023 Filing 77 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 1 Left Click Distribution LLC by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 23, 2023 Filing 76 Declaration re #73 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Reilly, Craig)
December 23, 2023 Filing 75 Declaration re #73 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig)
December 23, 2023 Filing 74 Memorandum in Support re #73 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Reilly, Craig)
December 23, 2023 Filing 73 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 23, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize) (Reilly, Craig)
December 22, 2023 Filing 71 MOTION Partial dissolve of TRO and Partial Transfer by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #65 Motion Joint MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO and Sever and Transfer Defendant No. 5 7TWENTY; ORDERED as follows: (1) The Temporary Restraining Order (ECF 14) is hereby DISSOLVED as against Defendant JD720 LLC; (2) Amazon.com shall immediately release the following account (see order for details); and (3) The case as against Defendant JD720 LLC is hereby TRANSFERRED to the District of Colorado. Signed by District Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/22/2023. (jlan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of Service re #66 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #67 Memorandum in Support, #62 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 22, 2023 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of Service re #66 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #67 Memorandum in Support, by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 22, 2023 Case transferred (as to defendant JD720 LLC) to the District of Colorado. Case file, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jlan)
December 21, 2023 Filing 67 Memorandum in Support re #66 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Schedule A, #2 Exhibit B - Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Chart)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 21, 2023 Filing 66 [WITHDRAWN PER ECF 87 as to Defendant No. 59 GSWK] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal) Modified on 12/27/2023 (Dest). Modified on 1/5/2024 (lcre, ).
December 21, 2023 Filing 65 Joint MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO and Sever and Transfer Defendant No. 5 7Twenty by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 31, BearZzZ (Amazon Merchant ID A1UK3G0SMQY3TC), Defendant No. 36, ACE MOD (Amazon Merchant ID A1X1P8TMKB0B4Y), and Defendant No. 109, U-Neat (Amazon Merchant ID A3F65AA419TXWI) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 31, BearZzZ, Defendant No. 36, ACE MOD, and Defendant No. 109, U-Neat. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/21/2023. (jlan)
December 21, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 109 U-Neat by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 20, 2023 Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (lcre, )
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction Scheduling Order (Dkt. 58) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is furtherORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary injunction no later than December 21, 2023, Defendants may file an opposition no later than January 4, 2024, and Plaintiff may file any reply no later than January 9, 2024. The Court will hear argument on the motion for preliminary injunction on January 12, 2024.It is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) shall be extended until Wednesday, January 3, 2024, at 5:00 P.M. Plaintiff may move for a further extension through the preliminary injunction hearing prior to this expiration date if there is good cause. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/20/2023. (Dcrow, )
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Darren Heitner for Defendant No. 19 OGERY Direct (Amazon Merchant ID A1GRYX679EXF26). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/19/2023. (swil)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Alan Wilmot for Defendant No. 19 OGERY Direct (Amazon Merchant ID A1GRYX679EXF26). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/19/2023. (swil)
December 19, 2023 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION Scheduling order for PI Briefing re #47 Order,, filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - e-mails, #2 Exhibit B - Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Chart, #5 Exhibit E - Chart, #6 Exhibit F - Chart, #7 Exhibit G - Chart)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 19, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION Scheduling order for PI Briefing re #47 Order,, by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 19, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 36 ACE MOD by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 19, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 31 BearZzZ by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 99, HomeWetBar Gifts (Amazon Merchant ID A39KJABNXR68CO), Defendant No. 100, HomeWetBar Gifts (Amazon Merchant ID A39KJABNXR68CO), Defendant No. 79, Aumpkin (Amazon Merchant ID A2U55VA1ZR5EUU), Defendant No. 63, EcommAtom LLC (Amazon Merchant ID A2JLKXKB0OBM2D), Defendant No. 111, Amazon Click to Save (Amazon Merchant ID A3ITMN7TLDLXFM), Defendant No. 34, Flint & Barrel (Amazon Merchant ID Al WQ3MSSS3F9IX), and Defendant No. 40, Virtuous Shop LLC (Amazon Merchant ID A20DE4J9ATAYKF), are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 99, HomeWetBar Gifts, Defendant No. 100, HomeWetBar Gifts, Defendant No. 79, Aumpkin, Defendant No. 63, EcommAtom LLC, Defendant No. 111, Amazon Click to Save, Defendant No. 34, Flint & Barrel, and Defendant No. 40, Virtuous Shop LLC in re #48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #50 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #51 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #53 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #54 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/18/2023. (Sbro)
December 18, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 40 Virtuous Shop LLC by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 34 Flint & Barrel by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 111 Amazon Click to Save by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 63 EcommAtom LLC by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 79 Aumpkin by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 100 HomeWetBar Gifts by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 17, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 99 HomeWetBar Gifts by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that the re #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #14 ) shall be extended until, and will expire absent further good cause shown on, Wednesday, December 20, 2023 at 5:00 P.M. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a brief proposing a preliminary injunction schedule and addressing the following substantive issues by the close of business on Tuesday, December 19, 2023 (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/15/2023. (lcre, )
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 141 Bypower (Amazon Merchant ID AIRUV7JSF4LFX) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED that Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #14 ) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 141, Bypower re #45 NOTICE filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/15/2023. (lcre, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC re #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Correction of Notice (Sheets, Kendal)
December 15, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant 140 Bypower by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order By Home Wet Bar LLC filed by The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Keith Winter, #2 Affidavit of Cecil Key, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order)(Key, Cecil)
December 14, 2023 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order By JD720 LLC filed by The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joel, #2 Affidavit of Cecil Key, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order)(Key, Cecil)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 17, Deals-Everywhere (Amazon Merchant ID AIEEIVG18A30DZ) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 17, Deals-Everywhere in re #40 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/14/2023. (Sbro)
December 14, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 17 Deals Everywhere by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 6, Busy Bee (Amazon Merchant ID A158GX06PONXZ) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 6, Busy Bee in re #33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/14/2023. (Sbro)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that the motion (Dkt. 37) is GRANTED (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/14/2023. (Sbro)
December 14, 2023 Filing 37 Joint MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 36 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Darren Heitner and Certification of Local Counsel Hyung Gyu Sun Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9265845. by The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Sun, Hyung Gyu)
December 14, 2023 Filing 35 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alan Wilmot and Certification of Local Counsel Hyung Gyu Sun Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9265774. by The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (Sun, Hyung Gyu)
December 14, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Hyung Gyu Sun on behalf of The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (Sun, Hyung Gyu)
December 14, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant No. 6 Busy Bee by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC re #30 Memorandum in Support, #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order for Waiver of Hearing (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service re #30 Memorandum in Support, #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Kendal Meredith Sheets on behalf of Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kendal Sheets)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 14, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 102, Nixxi (Amazon Merchant ID A3AWLQQ72QSTX9) and Defendant No. 85, Fine Goods Co. (Amazon Merchant ID A2XXOSEV8B88XA) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that the Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. 14) is dissolved as to Defendant No. 102, Nixxi, and Defendant No. 85, Fine Goods Co. in re #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/13/2023. (Sbro)
December 12, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 11, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant No. 27, JZ US Direct (Amazon Merchant ID AIOGKTZITU16B3) are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/11/2023. (Sbro)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that the re #23 Motion is GRANTED. ORDERED that : 1. The Temporary Restraining Order re #14 is hereby DISSOLVED as against Defendant Digital Distillery. 2. Amazon shall immediately release the following accounts (See Order for Details). 3. Except as modified herein, the Tempoary Restraining Order re #14 remains in full force and effect until December 15, 2023.4. The claims against Digital Distillery are hereby SEVERED from this action pursuant to Rule 21. 5. The action as against Digital Distillery (i.e., the severed claims) is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/11/2023. (lcre, )
December 11, 2023 Case transferred (as to defendant Digital Distillery) to the Western District of Missouri, Western Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (lcre, )
December 11, 2023 ***Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2023 terminated per MSN Chambers. (lcre, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 Joint MOTION Partially Dissolving TRO, Severing Claims, and Transferring re #14 Order,,,, by Digital Distillery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion no later than 12:00 P.M. on Monday, December 11, 2023; and it is further ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on Digital Distillery LLC's motion on Tuesday, December 12, 2023, at 11:00 A.M. in re #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order filed by Digital Distillery LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/08/2023. (wgar, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Digital Distillery LLC re #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order,,,, NOTICE OF FILING REVISED PROPOSED ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REVISED)(Reilly, Craig)
December 8, 2023 Set Deadline as to #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff. (wgar, )
December 7, 2023 Filing 20 Request for Hearing by Digital Distillery LLC re #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order,,,, (Reilly, Craig)
December 7, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration re #18 Memorandum in Support, #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order,,,, by Digital Distillery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reilly, Craig)
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order,,,, filed by Digital Distillery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Reilly, Craig)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION TO DISSOLVE TRO re #14 Order,,,, by Digital Distillery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Digital Distillery LLC (Reilly, Craig)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC (Sheets, Kendal)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED thatt the MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #2 is GRANTED. ORDERED that Amazon.com shall freeze all accounts associated with Defendants identified in Schedule A attached to the complaint and prohibit the transfer of any monies held in such accounts.ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve limited discovery on Amazon.com sufficient to discover the amounts of any monies held by Amazon.com in association with Defendants. identified in Schedule A as well as any name, email address, address, telephone number, and bank account associated with such Amazon.com account(s). ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve the complaint upon Defendants using the email addresses determined during the course of limited discovery.ORDERED that any information disclosed to Plaintiff in response to discovery issued pursuant to this Order may be used solely for the purpose of protecting Plaintiff's rights as set forth in the complaint.ORDERED that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 65(b)(2) this Temporary Restraining Order will expire on December 15, 2023. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 12/1/2023. (lcre, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff:Motion Hearing held on 12/1/2023. Appearances of counsel. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #2 argued and GRANTED. Motion Granted with regard to all defendants in both cases. TRO expires on 12/15/23. Parties directed to confer and submit joint briefing schedule. Motion with regard to discovery and service of email GRANTED. (Court Reporter D. Salters.)(lcre, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil Elvis Key, Jr on behalf of The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (Key, Cecil)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil Elvis Key, Jr on behalf of The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (Key, Cecil)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Joseph J Zito for Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 11/29/2023. (swil)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Electronic Device Application. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 11/29/2023. (Sbro)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Electronic Device Application by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal) (Main Document 7 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 11/29/2023) (Sbro).
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Zito and Certification of Local Counsel Kendal Sheets Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9238207. by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Sheets, Kendal)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Report on the filing or determination of an action. (jlan)
November 22, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (jlan)
November 22, 2023 Set Deadline as to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/28/2023 re #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Sheets, Kendal)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheets, Kendal)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheets, Kendal)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9223979.), filed by Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Schedule A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Sheets, Kendal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC v. The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thousand Oaks Barrel Co., LLC
Represented By: Kendal Meredith Sheets
Represented By: Joseph J Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships, Companies, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Represented By: Alan Wilmot
Represented By: Cecil Elvis Key, Jr.
Represented By: Darren Heitner
Represented By: Hyung Gyu Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Distillery LLC
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guizhou Wei Shi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si (dba Kovize)
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?