Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC et al v. Clemente et al
Plaintiff: Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC and F2E Holdings LLC
Defendant: Joshua Clemente, Timothy G. Clemente and Joshua R. Clemente
Case Number: 1:2023cv01608
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 281 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Joshua R. Clemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
January 17, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy G. Clemente.(Henson, Andrew)
January 17, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Henson on behalf of Timothy G. Clemente (Henson, Andrew)
January 3, 2024 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joshua R. Clemente, Timothy G. Clemente, filed by Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC.(Mills, Laurin)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERED that the motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted andplaintiff shall file the first amended complaint as a separate docket entry. Given the filing of an amended complaint, the pending demurrer filed by defendant Timothy Clemente in Fairfax County Circuit Court (Docket no. 1-5) prior to the removal of this action is denied without prejudice in re #13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 1/3/2024. (swil)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Re Handling and Labeling of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/02/2024. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
January 2, 2024 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mills, Laurin)
December 29, 2023 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Donnelly, Brian)
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Joshua R. Clemente, Timothy G. Clemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 Filed in error and removed - Duplicate (jlan)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - At the request of counsel for defendant Joshua Clemente, the settlement conference scheduled for Monday, January 8, 2024, is cancelled. If the parties wish to reschedule a conference at a later time, they should contact the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/21/2023. (Dcrow, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 Waiver of re #12 Reply Waiver of Oral Argument on Pending Demurrer by Joshua R. Clemente, Timothy G. Clemente (LeGrand, Rebecca)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference 1. All discovery shall be concluded by April 19, 2024. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures should have been completed by December 19, 2023.4. Expert disclosures shall be governed by the schedule set forth on page 2 of the Joint Discovery Plan. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court.5. Plaintiffs recently filed a motion for leave to file an amended complaint andwaived a hearing. (Docket nos. 13, 14). The briefing shall be governed by the following schedule: defendants' opposition to the motion shall be filed by December 27, 2023, and plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by January 2, 2024. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/20/2023. (Dcrow, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2023. Pltf appeared through Rebecca LeGrand and Laurin Mill. Deft Timothy Clemente appeared Pro Se. Discovery Plan approved. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(Dcrow, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 Waiver of re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC (Mills, Laurin)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Written Consent of Member Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint (Redline))(Mills, Laurin)
December 20, 2023 Remark - On 12/18/23, a reply to #7 opposition to Demurrer was filed. At this time, a notice of hearing or a notice of waiver of oral argument needs to be filed by the defendants (PER LMB CHAMBERS). (wgar, )
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 Reply to #7 Opposition to Demurrer filed by Joshua R. Clemente, Timothy G. Clemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Demurrer)(LeGrand, Rebecca)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled in this matter for Wednesday, December 20, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. shall be held at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/15/2023. (Dcrow, )
December 15, 2023 Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2023 at 12:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dcrow, )
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 26(F) Report and Joint Discovery Plan by Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC.(Mills, Laurin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Answer To First Counterclaim of Defendant Joshua R. Clemente by Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Mills, Laurin)
December 12, 2023 Set Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dcrow, )
December 10, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Donnelly, Brian)
December 10, 2023 Filing 7 Opposition to Demurrer of T. Clemente (CORRECTED) filed by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Donnelly, Brian)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Mills, Laurin)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 Opposition to Demurrer of T. Clemente filed by F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC. (Donnelly, Brian)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 401 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 4/19/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/29/2023. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(jlan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Patrick Donnelly on behalf of F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC (Donnelly, Brian)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurin Howard Mills on behalf of F2E Holdings LLC, Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC (Mills, Laurin)
November 27, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Dest)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9236271.), filed by Joshua Clemente. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Fairfax County Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (affidavit of service), #3 Exhibit 3 (J. Clemente Answer and Counterclaim), #4 Exhibit 4 (affidavit of service), #5 Exhibit 5 (T. Clemente Answer and Demurrer), #6 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(LeGrand, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC et al v. Clemente et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Integrated Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Laurin Howard Mills
Represented By: Brian Patrick Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F2E Holdings LLC
Represented By: Laurin Howard Mills
Represented By: Brian Patrick Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Clemente
Represented By: Rebecca Suzanne LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy G. Clemente
Represented By: Andrew Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua R. Clemente
Represented By: Rebecca Suzanne LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?