MSN Laboratories Private Limited v. Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche
Plaintiff: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Defendant: Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche
Case Number: 1:2023cv01675
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Non-Infringement - Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing proceedings held on January 12, 2024, before Judge Claude M. Hilton, Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Egal, Telephone number 571-229-7074. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2024.(egal, julie)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, for the reasons stated from the bench, granting #14 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/12/2024. (wgar, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 32 Delivery Status Update: Alternate Service of Process - Delivered 12/26/23. (wgar, )
January 12, 2024 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Claude M. Hilton: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2024 re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. Kevin Sprenger, Ramachandran Iyer, Richard Juang, and Ronald Daignault appeared on behalf of the plaintiff.Erica Andersen, Christopher Sipes, and Brianne Bharkhda appeared on behalf of the defendant.Matter argued. #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware - GRANTED. Order to follow. Court Reporter: J. Goodwin Egal(tran)
January 12, 2024 Case transferred to the District of Delaware. Electronic File, copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (wgar, )
January 12, 2024 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in the District of Delaware as case 1:24-cv-00048, filed 01/12/2024. (wgar, )
January 10, 2024 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service re #29 Reply to Response to Motion,,, by Erica Nicole Andersen on behalf of Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche (Andersen, Erica)
January 10, 2024 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Marc Villain in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay Proceedings, #2 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Erica N. Andersen in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer or Stay Proceedings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Andersen Reply Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Andersen Reply Declaration)(Andersen, Erica)
January 10, 2024 Filing 28 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarahi Uribe and Certification of Local Counsel Erica N. Andersen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9302750. by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Andersen, Erica)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Brianne Bharkhda for Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/9/2024. (swil)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Christopher N. Sipes for Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/9/2024. (swil)
January 8, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE by MSN Laboratories Private Limited re #22 Memorandum in Opposition,, of Supplemental Authority (Iyer, Ramachandran)
January 5, 2024 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brianne Bharkhda and Certification of Local Counsel Erica N. Andersen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9295492. by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Andersen, Erica)
January 5, 2024 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher N. Sipes and Certification of Local Counsel Erica N. Andersen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9295447. by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Andersen, Erica)
January 4, 2024 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Sagyam, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Juang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Proposed Order)(Iyer, Ramachandran)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 10) is DENIED AS MOOT pending Defendant Bioproject's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 01/03/2024. (dvanm)
January 3, 2024 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Juang and Certification of Local Counsel Chandran B. Iyer Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9290910. by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 EXHIBIT D (Corrected) by MSN Laboratories Private Limited.. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 22, 2023 Set Deadline as to #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service re #13 Notice of Appearance, #15 Memorandum in Support,, #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, #16 Notice of Hearing Date by Erica Nicole Andersen on behalf of Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche (Andersen, Erica)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Andersen, Erica)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date re #15 Memorandum in Support,, #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (Andersen, Erica)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware filed by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Erica N. Andersen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Erica N. Andersen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Erica N. Andersen, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Erica N. Andersen, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Erica N. Andersen, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Andersen, Erica)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware by Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. (Andersen, Erica)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Nicole Andersen on behalf of Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche (Andersen, Erica)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 Waiver of re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process by MSN Laboratories Private Limited (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 20, 2023 Notice of Correction re #10 to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald M. Daignault and Certification of Local Counsel Chandran B. Iyer Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9273754. by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 Letter regarding alternative service. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm)
December 8, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Sprenger on behalf of MSN Laboratories Private Limited (Sprenger, Kevin)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ramachandran Iyer on behalf of MSN Laboratories Private Limited (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by MSN Laboratories Private Limited Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent or trademark (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Iyer, Ramachandran)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9255276.), filed by MSN Laboratories Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Iyer, Ramachandran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSN Laboratories Private Limited v. Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSN Laboratories Private Limited
Represented By: Kevin Sprenger
Represented By: Ramachandran Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioprojet Societe Civile De Recherche
Represented By: Brianne Bharkhda
Represented By: Christopher N. Sipes
Represented By: Erica Nicole Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?