XYZ Corporation v. Unincorporated Associations
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Defendant: Unincorporated Associations and The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2024cv00514
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and hereby is, granted; and it is further ORDERED that the temporary restraining order granted on May 8, 2024, which is scheduled to expire on May 24, 2024, is extended in effect until June 7, 2024 in re #40 Third MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/22/2024. (swil)
May 22, 2024 Filing 43 Memorandum in Support re #40 Third MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
May 22, 2024 Filing 42 Declaration re #40 Third MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order of Monica Talley by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
May 22, 2024 Filing 41 Waiver of re #40 Third MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation (Talley, Monica)
May 22, 2024 Filing 40 Third MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and hereby is, granted; and it is further ORDERED that the temporary restraining order granted on April 24, 2024, which is scheduled to expire on May 10, 2024, is extended in effect until May 24, 2024. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 05/08/2024. (dvanm)
May 7, 2024 Filing 38 Memorandum in Support re #35 Second MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
May 7, 2024 Filing 37 Declaration re #35 Second MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order of Monica Talley by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
May 7, 2024 Filing 36 Waiver of re #35 Second MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation (Talley, Monica)
May 7, 2024 Filing 35 Second MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and hereby is, granted; and it is further ORDERED that the temporary restraining order granted on April 12, 2024, which is scheduled to expire on April 26, 2024, is extended in effect until May 10 2024. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 04/24/2024. (dvanm)
April 23, 2024 Filing 33 Declaration re #30 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order of Monica Talley by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
April 23, 2024 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order filed by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
April 23, 2024 Filing 31 Waiver of re #30 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation (Talley, Monica)
April 23, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/12/2024. (Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff's Counsel on 4/12/2024)(dzir)
April 12, 2024 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2024 re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by XYZ Corporation. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff. Defense Counsel not present. Motion is granted. Counsel is advised to file a motion to unseal the case as well as suggestions for an amended case caption as soon as the defendants have been served. Order to follow. (Court Reporter S. Austin)(dzir)
April 12, 2024 Filing 27 EXHIBIT (Corrected [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Asset Restraint and Expedited Discovery) by XYZ Corporation.. (Talley, Monica)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED that the Motion shall be, and hereby is, granted; and it is furtherORDERED that Plaintiff is permitted to serve process, and any subsequent filings made by Plaintiff in this case, on Defendants by email. For service of process, Plaintiff shall email each Defendant a copy of the summons, a copy of this order, and a copy of the complaint. ORDERED that following service of process by email of the Defendants, Plaintiff shall file a notice of service with the Clerk's office affirming compliance with this order indicating the date the emails were sent to each Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 4/3/2024. (dvanm)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Nicholas John Nowak for XYZ Corporation. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/1/2024. (swil)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Seal; and it is further ORDERED that the instant proceeding, including all filings herein and the caption and identities of the parties be filed and maintained UNDER SEAL in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c)(1) and Local Civil Rule 5, pending issuance and service of the temporary restraining order on the relevant parties and requested actions taken; and it's further ORDERED that once the temporary restraining order has been served on the relevant parties and the requested actions taken, Plaintiff shall move to unseal these documents (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/1/2024. (Dest)
April 1, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 MOTION to Seal. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (wgar, )
April 1, 2024 Set Deadline as to #18 MOTION for Service by Publication. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (wgar, )
April 1, 2024 Notice of Correction re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION to Seal . Unfortunately, the documents contain more than one motion for relief. (As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the same document separately for each motion relief.) Please refile the Under Seal Motion for Expedited Discovery and Under Seal Motion for Temporarily Proceed Under Pseudonym for Good Cause separately. (Dest)
March 29, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (Dest)
March 29, 2024 Filing 23 Under Seal Report on the filing or determination of an action (AO 120) (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 7, #2 Part 3 of 7, #3 Part 4 of 7, #4 Part 5 of 7, #5 Part 6 of 7, #6 Part 7 of 7) (Talley, Monica). Modified text to correct filing event on 4/1/2024 (Dest).
March 29, 2024 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas John Nowak and Certification of Local Counsel Monica Riva Talley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9444649. by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 12, 2024 re #18 MOTION for Service by Publication (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 20 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION for Service by Publication , #2 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 19 Sealed Document (Declaration of Monica Talley) re #18 MOTION for Service by Publication , #2 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Service by Publication by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 12, 2024 re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 16 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #2 MOTION to Seal . (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 10 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 9 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 12 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 8 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 7 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 10 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 6 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 9 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Exhibit 5 to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 8 Sealed Document (Financial Interest Disclosure Statement) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (Schedule A to the Complaint) re #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Seal , #6 Sealed Document. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 6 Sealed Document (Verified Complaint) re #2 MOTION to Seal , #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for April 12, 2024 re #2 MOTION to Seal (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by XYZ Corporation re #2 MOTION to Seal (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Seal filed by XYZ Corporation. (Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talley, Monica)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BVAEDC-9444243.), filed by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talley, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XYZ Corporation v. Unincorporated Associations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Represented By: Monica Riva Talley
Represented By: Nicholas John Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unincorporated Associations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?