Adams v. Del Toro
Plaintiff: Antonio R Adams and Antonio R. Adams
Defendant: Carlos Del Toro
Case Number: 1:2024cv00655
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: William E Fitzpatrick
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the motion re #7 is GRANTED. ORDERED that this action shall proceed upon the administrative record of proceedings before the Board for Corrections of Naval Records (BCNR) without discovery (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 6/11/2024. (lcre, )
June 4, 2024 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for a Briefing Schedule by Carlos Del Toro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mezger, Matthew)
June 4, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service by Carlos Del Toro. All Defendants. (Mezger, Matthew)
June 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mezger on behalf of Carlos Del Toro (Mezger, Matthew)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio R. Adams. Carlos Del Toro served on 4/23/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Executed Summons SECNAV, #2 Supplement Executed Summons EDVA, #3 Supplement Executed Summons USAG)(Pristera, Brian)
April 23, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carlos Del Toro, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Cwel)
April 22, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Cwel)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Antonio R Adams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Pristera, Brian)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9484593.), filed by Antonio R Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pristera, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Del Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio R Adams
Represented By: Brian Pristera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio R. Adams
Represented By: Brian Pristera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Del Toro
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?