Zahed et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Plaintiff: Amir Zahed and Regwida Neayish
Defendant: Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, UR M. Jaddou, Acting Associate Dir Ted H. Kim, Attorney General US Merrick B. Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ted H. Kim and Merrick B. Garland
Case Number: 1:2024cv00681
Filed: April 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: William B Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed on US Attorney (Homiller, Charles)
May 13, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed on Alejandro Mayorkas (Homiller, Charles)
May 13, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed on Merrick Garland (Homiller, Charles)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Tamunotonte Battle-Ax Fenny for Regwida Neayish,Tamunotonte Battle-Ax Fenny for Amir Zahed. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 5/7/2024. (swil)
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Cwel)
April 25, 2024 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
April 25, 2024 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tamunotonte Battle-Ax Fenny and Certification of Local Counsel Charles J. Homiller, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9493527. by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to US Attorney by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Alejandro Mayorkas by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Ted H. Kim by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to UR M. Jaddou by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Merrick Garland by Regwida Neayish, Amir Zahed. (Homiller, Charles)
April 25, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BVAEDC-9493447.), filed by Amir Zahed, Regwida Neayish. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Homiller, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zahed et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Zahed
Represented By: Charles Jerry Homiller, Jr.
Represented By: Tamunotonte Battle-Ax Fenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regwida Neayish
Represented By: Charles Jerry Homiller, Jr.
Represented By: Tamunotonte Battle-Ax Fenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of DHS ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Associate Dir Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General US Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?