US Inventor, Inc. et al. v. Vidal et al.
Plaintiff: Us Inventor, Inc., Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network Of Minnesota, San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc., Mercexchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, US Investor, Inc., Inventor's Association of South Central Kansas and San Diego Inventor's Forum, Inc.
Defendant: Katherine Vidal and United States Patent and Trademark Office
Case Number: 1:2024cv00708
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referring Judge: Lindsey R Vaala
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Maritime Subsidy Board
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office, Katherine Vidal. (Fuchs, Yuri)
June 21, 2024 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Inventor's Association of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network of Minnesota, MercExchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, San Diego Inventor's Forum, Inc., US Investor, Inc.. (Redway, Henrik)
June 10, 2024 Set Deadline as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. (triv)
June 7, 2024 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing Date set for July 11, 2024 re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fuchs, Yuri)
June 7, 2024 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by United States Patent and Trademark Office, Katherine Vidal. (Fuchs, Yuri)
June 7, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States Patent and Trademark Office, Katherine Vidal. (Fuchs, Yuri)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SO ORDERED in re #20 NOTICE filed by Katherine Vidal, United States Patent and Trademark Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 5/16/2024. (Sbro, ) Modified on 5/28/2024 (Sbro, ).
May 14, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE by United States Patent and Trademark Office, Katherine Vidal of Withdrawal of Appearance (Fuchs, Yuri)
May 14, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuri Fuchs on behalf of United States Patent and Trademark Office, Katherine Vidal (Fuchs, Yuri)
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jordan E. Garsson for Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas,Jordan E. Garsson for Inventors Network Of Minnesota,Jordan E. Garsson for Mercexchange, L.L.C.,Jordan E. Garsson for Paul Morinville,Jordan E. Garsson for San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc.,Jordan E. Garsson for Us Inventor, Inc. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/10/2024. (swil)
May 9, 2024 Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to upload a better quality document re #16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Robert Daniels and Certification of Local Counsel Henrik Jonathan Redway (Sbro, )
May 7, 2024 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordan E. Garsson and Certification of Local Counsel Henrik Jonathan Redway by Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network Of Minnesota, Mercexchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc., Us Inventor, Inc.. (Redway, Henrik)
May 7, 2024 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Robert Daniels and Certification of Local Counsel Henrik Jonathan Redway by Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network Of Minnesota, Mercexchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc., Us Inventor, Inc.. (Redway, Henrik)
May 7, 2024 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Robert Daniels and Certification of Local Counsel Henrik Jonathan Redway by Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network Of Minnesota, Mercexchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc., Us Inventor, Inc.. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9514207.. (Redway, Henrik)
May 7, 2024 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jordan E. Garsson and Certification of Local Counsel Henrik Jonathan Redway by Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas, Inventors Network Of Minnesota, Mercexchange, L.L.C., Paul Morinville, San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc., Us Inventor, Inc.. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9514210.. (Redway, Henrik)
April 30, 2024 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:24-cv-00273. Original file and docket sheet received.
April 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 4/25/2024. (hmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #13 Unopposed Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Virginia. See the attached Order for details. The Clerk of Court is requested to close the case in this district. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 04/15/2024. (lctnm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 12, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Virginia Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C., PAUL MORINVILLE, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, KATHERINE VIDAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ontell, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Ontell on behalf of All Defendants (Ontell, Joshua) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2024. (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/14/2024. (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Government's #12 Consent Motion for Extension. The Government's response to the Complaint is now due by June 7, 2024, instead of April 8. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 04/03/2024. (lctnm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs filed the Complaint in this case on January 30, 2024. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiffs have yet to file proof of service on each Defendant in accordance with the rules for serving agencies and employees of the United States. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(2). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service on each Defendant no later than 90 days after the Complaint is filed, which, in this case, is April 29, 2024. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to cause process to be served on each Defendant and file proof of such service by April 29, 2024. Failure to either do so or to establish good cause for the failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 04/02/2024. (lctnm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 8, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE served on 2/6/2024 (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 8, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHERINE VIDAL served on 2/6/2024 (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 ERRATA (correcting caption per LCvR 5.1(c)) by INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C., PAUL MORINVILLE, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC. re #1 Complaint,,,. (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 02/02/2024. (lctnm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, KATHERINE VIDAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zrtw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA (correcting caption per LCvR 5.1(c)) by INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C., PAUL MORINVILLE, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC. re #1 Complaint,,,. (Redway, Henrik) Modified on 2/5/2024 (zdp). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
February 1, 2024 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jredway@dickinsonwright.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
January 31, 2024 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C., PAUL MORINVILLE, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC. (Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
January 31, 2024 NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re #1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATIVE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, KATHERINE VIDAL in her official capacity performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CDCDC-10653825) filed by PAUL MORINVILLE, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC., MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Katherine Vidal, # 7 Summons Matthew Graves, # 8 Summons US Attorney General, # 9 Summons USPTO)(Redway, Henrik).Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/7/2024. (zmrl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]
January 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATIVE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, KATHERINE VIDAL in her official capacity performing the functions and duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CDCDC-10653825) filed by PAUL MORINVILLE, INVENTORS NETWORK OF MINNESOTA, INVENTORS ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH CENTRAL KANSAS, SAN DIEGO INVENTORS FORUM, INC., US INVENTOR, INC., MERCEXCHANGE, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Katherine Vidal, #7 Summons Matthew Graves, #8 Summons US Attorney General, #9 Summons USPTO)(Redway, Henrik) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Inventor, Inc. et al. v. Vidal et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Us Inventor, Inc.
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventors Association Of South Central Kansas
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventors Network Of Minnesota
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Inventors Forum, Inc.
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercexchange, L.L.C.
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Morinville
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Investor, Inc.
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inventor's Association of South Central Kansas
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Inventor's Forum, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan E. Garsson
Represented By: Henrik Jonathan Redway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Vidal
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Ontell
Represented By: Yuri Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Ontell
Represented By: Yuri Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?