Federico et al v. Lincoln Military Housing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Joe Federico and Shelley Federico |
Defendant: |
Lincoln Military Housing, LLC, Mid-Atlantic Military Family Communities LLC and LPC Property Management, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv00080 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia |
Office: |
Norfolk Office |
County: |
Norfolk City |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert G. Doumar |
Presiding Judge: |
F. Bradford Stillman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
1017
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 988 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees is DENIED. Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to pay Plaintiffs $4,500 in attorneys' fees within THIRTY (30)DAYS of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 8/31/16. (tbro)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing
1015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 994 Motion for New Trial. Please see order for details. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 8/23/16. (tbro)
|
December 31, 2014 |
Filing
405
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 309 Motion for Sanctions. The Plaintiffs shall bear the cost of expert production of electronic media in the amount of $29,220.04. (ECF No. 372-1, at 3). The court shall also award a portion of the fees incurred by the Defendants in bringing the Motion to Compel after evaluating the facts required by Rule 37(a)(5)(A). To the extent Defendants' motion sought other or further relief, it is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 12/31/14. (tbro)
|
August 13, 2014 |
Filing
325
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 MOTION to QUASH AND/OR LIMIT SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO LOCAL TV. LLC, D/B/A WTKR TELEVISION, AND LAURIE SIMMONS AND OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 8/13/14. (tbro)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
184
OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/25/13. (afar)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
65
OPINION AND ORDER - the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Consolidate and hereby CONSOLIDATES the above-captioned cases for the purposes of pre-trial motions, discovery, and possible fault. The Court will handle these matters separately for the purpose of determining damages. The Court further ORDERS the Clerk of Court to assign 2:12cv466 currently assigned to the Honorable Raymond Jackson to the Honorable Robert G. Doumar. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar and filed on 10/3/2012. (bnew)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?