JTH Tax, Inc. v. Hines
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc.
Defendant: Charles Hines
Case Number: 2:2015cv00558
Filed: December 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Virginia Beach City
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Krask
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 120 Report and Recommendations. The court DIRECTS the Defendant, to the extent he wishes to purs ue those counterclaims that have been dismissed without prejudice, to raise such claims before an arbitrator. The Defendant is ADVISED that he may not appeal from this Memorandum Order, or from any other adverse order against him until entry of the Final Order in this case. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 3/1/18 and filed 3/2/18. Copies distributed to all parties 3/2/18. (ldab, )
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re 116 Motion for Default Judgment; 125 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, defendant's Motion for Default Judgment is denied and plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees incurred in responding to the motion is DENIED. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 2/23/18. Copies distributed to all parties 2/23/18. (ldab, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re: 121 Report and Recommendations. 102 Motion for Sanctions; 103 Memorandum in Opposition filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. The court does hereby ADOPT AND APPROVE IN FULL the findings and recommendations set forth in the R&R of the United States Magistrate Judge, filed December 15, 2017. ECF No. 121. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/11/18. Copies distributed to all parties 1/11/18.(ldab, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re: 66 Motion to Dismiss; 80 Report and Recommendations. The court does hereby OVERRULE the Defendant's Objections, and ADOPT AND APPROVE IN FULL the findings and recommendations set forth in the R&R of the United States Magistrat e Judge. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED without prejudice to the Defendant filing a second amended counterclaim within twenty-one days of the entry of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 8/24/17. Copies distributed to all parties 8/24/17.(ldab, )
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: 35 Motion for Default Judgment; 47 Report and Recommendations. The court, having examined the Objections to the R&R filed by the Plaintiff, and having made de novo findings with respect thereto, does hereby O VERRULE the Plaintiff's Objections; ADOPT AND APPROVE, with the exception of the Magistrate Judge's finding of no dilatory conduct, the findings and recommendations set forth in the R&R of the United States Magistrate Judge, filed on Decemb er 15, 2016, ECF No. 47; DENY the Plaintiff's Motion filed on October 13, 2016, ECF No. 35; and DIRECT the Clerk to set aside the entry of default against the Defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/18/17. Copies distributed to all parties 1/18/17. (ldab, )
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 14 Motion to Change Venue; adopting Report and Recommendations re 15 Motion to Dismiss. The court, having examined the objections to the Reports and Recommendations and having made de novo findi ngs with respect thereto, does hereby adopt and approve in full the findings and recommendations set forth in the Reports and Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 28 and ECF No. 29) filed July 26, 2016. Accordingly, defendant's Motion for Change of Venue is DENIED and defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 9/1/16. Copies distributed to all parties 9/1/16. (ldab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax, Inc. v. Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Alvin Bryant
Represented By: Brett Alexander Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?