Genetic Veterinary Sciences, Inc. v. LABOklin GmbH & Co. KG et al
Plaintiff: Genetic Veterinary Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: LABOklin GmbH & Co. KG and The University of Bern
Case Number: 2:2017cv00108
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Miller
Presiding Judge: Henry C. Morgan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 OPINION & ORDER denying 176 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 02/20/2020. (bboy, )
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 OPINION & ORDER granting 140 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 5/11/2018. (jrin)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION AND ORDER denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 4/4/2018. (jrin)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and filed on 10/16/17. Copies distributed to all parties 10/16/17. (ldab, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genetic Veterinary Sciences, Inc. v. LABOklin GmbH & Co. KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genetic Veterinary Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Counts Cumby
Represented By: Calvin R. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew Fred Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LABOklin GmbH & Co. KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Bern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?