(DPP)CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Glenmark Generics Inc., U.S.A., Schering-Plough Corp. and Schering Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00439
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Agreed ORDER in case granting 143 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Pretrial Order No. 4 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM. (See order for details). Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/3/2018. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00266-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00423- RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00439-RBS-DEM (clou)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Jointly Proposed Pretrial Order No. 5. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/2/2018. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00023-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00039-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00071-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00108-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00116-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00130-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00213-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00232-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00266-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00352-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00403-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00423-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00439-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01000-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01001-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01002-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01003-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01004-RBS-DEM(clou )
September 5, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #6 MOTION to Compel (clou )
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response #8 to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Against Merck Defendants filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/31/2018 in 2:18md2836)(clou )
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration re #8 Response to Motion of Christopher D. Dusseault by MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Schering Corp., Schering-Plough Corp.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2018 in 2:18md2836) (clou )
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Against Merck Defendants filed by MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Schering Corp., Schering-Plough Corp.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2018 in 2:18md2836) (clou )
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd. waiver sent on 8/7/2018, Glenmark Generics Inc., U.S.A. waiver sent on 8/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (clou )
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Compel Against Merck Defendants filed by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/16/2018 in 2:18md2836) (clou )
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Against Merck Defendants by Albertsons Companies, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 08/16/2018 in 2:18md2836) (clou )
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Pretrial Order No. 4 - The court hereby ORDERS that the DPP file a consolidated complaint no later than September 13, 2018; the EPP file a consolidated amended complaint no later than September 13, 2018; and the Retailer Plaintiffs file an amended complaint, if desired, no later than September 13, 2018. (See order for specific details). Copies distributed to all counsel of record in all member cases as directed. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 8/15/18. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00023-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00035-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00039-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00071-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00108-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00116-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00130-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00213-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00232-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00266-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00352-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00403-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00423-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00439-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01000-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01001-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01002-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01003-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01004-RBS-DEM(clou )
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Pretrial Order No. 3 - GRANTING the following motions: Merck Defendants (ECF No. 42); Glenmark Defendants (ECF No. 40); Walgreens Plaintiffs (ECF No. 22); DPPs (ECF No. 16); the City of Providence, Rhode Island and Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Funds (ECF Nos. 50); the Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York Security Benefit Fund and the Retired Firefighters Security Benefit Fund of the Uniformed Firefighters Association (ECF No. 51). DENYING the following motions: "Majority EPPs" (ECF No. 58); Self Insured Schools of California (ECF No. 52); UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (ECF No. 41). (See order for specific details). Copies distributed to all counsel of record in all member cases as directed. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 8/14/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02836-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00023-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00035-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00039-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00071-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00108-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00116-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00130-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00213-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00232-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00266-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00352-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00403-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00423-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-00439-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01000-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01001-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01002-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01003-RBS-DEM, 2:18-cv-01004-RBS-DEM(clou)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (epri)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenmark Generics Inc., U.S.A., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Schering Corp., Schering-Plough Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6224638.), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (DPP)CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Andrew Reed
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSP Singapore Co. LLC
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Inc., U.S.A.
Represented By: Steven Andrew Reed
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering-Plough Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?