CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: Cannon Moss, Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company, Jerry Hall, Philip Merrilli, Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Thomas Hurlbut
Case Number: 2:2018cv00530
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Raymond A Jackson
2 Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Spain Flowers on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Flowers, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Durrum Wingfield on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Wingfield, Alan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 36 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lacy, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lacy, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Lacy, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Edward Lacy on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Lacy, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli. (Mullins, Maurice)
November 27, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss by Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli. (Mullins, Maurice)
November 27, 2018 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cannon Moss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Belote, Clark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Cannon Moss. (Belote, Clark)
November 27, 2018 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Chapman, James)
November 27, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company. (Chapman, James)
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Coburn, Samuel)
November 11, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Erbach on behalf of Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli (Erbach, John)
November 8, 2018 Case Reassigned to District Judge Mark S. Davis. District Judge Raymond A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark James Belote on behalf of Cannon Moss (Belote, Clark)
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Cannon Moss (Spivey, William)
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh McCoy Fain, III on behalf of Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli (Fain, Hugh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Francis Mullins on behalf of Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli (Mullins, Maurice)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (See order for details). Copies distributed to all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 11/2/2018. (clou)
November 2, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (clou )
November 2, 2018 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chapman, James)
November 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Caldwell Hartnett on behalf of Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company (Hartnett, David)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Darius Kobi Agyeman Davenport, Sr on behalf of Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company (Davenport, Darius)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Ryan Snow on behalf of Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company (Snow, W. Ryan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Duke Jones on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Jones, Belinda)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Smith on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Smith, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company. (Chapman, James)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Chapman, IV on behalf of Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company (Chapman, James)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Thomas Merritt on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Merritt, Craig)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Thomas Hurlbut by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Philip Merilli by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Jerry Hall by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint with attachments on 10/15/18 as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (tbro)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint with attachments on 10/15/18 as to Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company, filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (tbro)
October 8, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Hall, Thomas Hurlbut, Philip Merrilli, Cannon Moss, Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6303291.), filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Letter)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSX Transportation, Inc. v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon Moss
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Clark James Belote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk & Portsmouth Belt Line Railway Company
Represented By: W. Ryan Snow
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Darius Kobi Agyeman Davenport, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hall
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Hugh McCoy Fain, III
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Merrilli
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Hugh McCoy Fain, III
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Represented By: Michael Edward Lacy
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth Spain Flowers
Represented By: Craig Thomas Merritt
Represented By: Alan Durrum Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hurlbut
Represented By: Maurice Francis Mullins
Represented By: Hugh McCoy Fain, III
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Rebecca Gantt
Represented By: Benjamin Lucas Hatch
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?