Matousek v. Christian Psychotherapy
Plaintiff: Susan Neal Matousek
Defendant: Christian Psychotherapy, Dr. Huff and Jackie Butler
Case Number: 2:2018cv00595
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 18-2430 4CCA Case Manager Cathy Poulsen for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Susan Neal Matousek. (18-2430) (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #6 Notice of Appeal (epri, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(epri, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018. (epri, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Christian Psychotherapy, filed by Susan Neal Matousek.(epri, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to add Jackie Butler and Dr. Huff as named Defendants on the docket of this matter. However, for the reasons set forth in Order, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.27.18. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/26/2018. (epri, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matousek v. Christian Psychotherapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Psychotherapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Neal Matousek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?