Heghmann v. The Democratic National Committee et al

Plaintiff: Robert A. Heghmann
Defendant: The Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Karen L. Hass, Frank Leone, Tom Perez, Rep. Ben Rey Lujan, Elaine Luria, Doris Crouse-Mays and The Democratic National Committee
Case Number: 2:2018cv00605
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
1 Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tom Perez, served on 1/8/2019. (epri, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 12 Six (6) Summonses Issued on AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Doris Crouse-Mays, Karen L. Hass, Frank Leone, Rep. Ben Rey Lujan, Elaine Luria, Tom Perez. Summons packages mailed to pro se plaintiff on 12.27.18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of the Order to Show Cause filed by Robert A. Heghmann. (epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief,, filed by Robert A. Heghmann.(epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support of Order to Show Cause filed by Robert A. Heghmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(epri, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause by Robert A. Heghmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3)(epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Robert A. Heghmann. (epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Robert A. Heghmann. (epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Doris Crouse-Mays, Karen L. Hass, Frank Leone, Rep. Ben Rey Lujan, Elaine Luria, Tom Perez, The Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, The Democratic National Committee ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683040679.), filed by Robert A. Heghmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(epri, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 24683040679 (epri, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert A. Heghmann. (epri, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #1 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2, #4 Exhibit Part 3, #5 Proposed Memorandum in Support, #6 Exhibit) (epri, ).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is DENIED. If Plaintiff would like the Court to consider his submissions, he is DIRECTED to either (i) remit the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee, or (ii) re-submit a clear and complete IFP Application to the Court within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order. A copy of this Order, along with a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 11.28.18. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/27/2018. (epri, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert A. Heghmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Enoticing Motion, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Financial Disclosure Statement)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heghmann v. The Democratic National Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen L. Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rep. Ben Rey Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Luria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Crouse-Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Democratic National Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Heghmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?