Matousek v. Suntrust et al
Plaintiff: Susan Neal Matousek
Defendant: CEO William R. Jones and Suntrust
Case Number: 2:2018cv00620
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/14/2019) (epri, ).
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: the Court hereby IMPOSES the following system of pre-filing review upon Ms. Matousek: Ms. Matousek may not file any civil actions in the Eastem District of Virginia, in which she seeks in forma pauperis status, without seeking and obtaining Court approval to do so. If Ms. Matousek wishes to file a civil action, she must submit a "Motion for Leave to File Suit in Federal Court," accompanied by: (i) a copy of this Pre-Filing Review Order; (ii) an "Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs;" (iii) a statement that the claims or relief sought are not frivolous and are made in good faith; (iv) a short and plain statement setting forth a valid basis for the claims or relief sought; and (v) a statement that the claims or relief sought either have or have not been raised before in other litigation, and if they have been previously raised, the name of the case, the court where it was filed, the case number, and the disposition of the claims. Upon receipt of any such "Motion for Leave to File Suit in Federal Court," the Clerk is DIRECTED to send the submission to a United States District Judge of this Court to determine whether leave to file shall be granted. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket this Pre-Filing Review Order in each of the above-referenced cases, and to send a copy of this Pre-Filing Review Order to Ms. Matousek via U.S. Mail. Copies sent as DIRECTED on 1.7.19. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 1/7/2019. (epri, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CEASE AND DESIST: IT IS ORDERED that Ms. Matousek CEASE AND DESIST from: (i) making excessive, inappropriate, and/or harassing telephone calls to the Clerk's Office; (ii) leaving voicemail messages for the Clerk's Office after the close of business; (iii) engaging in face-to-face verbal attacks on the Clerk's Office staff; and (iv) conducting herself in a disruptive manner during visits to the Clerk's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: (i) Ms. Matousek must direct all of her inquiries regarding her cases in this Court to Angela Farlow of the Clerk's Office; (ii) Ms. Matousek must submit all future filings to this Court by mail to the Clerk's Office; and (iii) if Ms. Matousek wishes to personally visit the Clerk's Office (for reasons other than filing documents), Ms. Matousek must (a) limit such in-person visits to no more than two visits per week, unless permission is requested from - and granted by - the Court, and (b) conduct her business expeditiously and courteously. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket this Order to Cease and Desist in each of the above-referenced cases, and to send a copy of this Order to Cease and Desist to Ms. Matousek via U.S. Mail. Copies sent as DIRECTED on 1.7.19. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 1/7/2019. (epri, ).
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Show Cause Hearing before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson held on 1/3/2019. Susan Matousek present. Comments of court.C ourt presented evidence - witness sworn and testified. Plaintiff presented evidence - witness sworn and testified. Court will issue prefiling injunction order and will issue a cease and desist order to address the conduct of the plaintiff. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Janet Collins, OCR.)(ptom, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(epri, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on January 3, 2019. at 11:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse at 600 Granby Street, Norfolk, Virginia23510, to allow Ms. Matousek an opportunity to be heard on this issue. Ms. Matousek is ORDERED to personally appear before the Court for the hearing. the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to personally serve a copy of this Order on Ms. Matousek on or before December 21, 2018. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to docket this Order in each of the above-referenced cases, and send a copy of this Order to Ms. Matousek via U.S. Mail. Copies sent as DIRECTED on 12.20.18 Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/20/2018. (epri, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(epri, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Submission by Susan Neal Matousek. (epri, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Neal Matousek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(epri, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2018: #2 Proposed Submission) (epri, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matousek v. Suntrust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO William R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Neal Matousek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?