Kurgan v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Walter Michael Kurgan
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Shapiro & Brown, LLP
Case Number: 2:2018cv00661
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shapiro & Brown, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c)(Savage, William) (Signature page replaced on 2/6/2019) (epri, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by Shapiro & Brown, LLP (Savage, William) (Signature page replaced on 2/6/2019) (epri, ).
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Shapiro & Brown, LLP. (Savage, William) (Signature page replaced on 2/6/2019) (epri, ).
January 31, 2019 Notice of Correction re #6 Brief in Support, Memorandum. An incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document using the correct event. (epri, )
January 31, 2019 Notice of Correction re #5 Brief in Support. The filing user has been notified to file the Motion to Dismiss and the Brief in Support as separate docket entries. The filing user has also been notified to include all elements of the nine-element signature block on future filings. (epri, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Brief in Support to #5 Brief in Support , Memorandum filed by Shapiro & Brown, LLP. (Savage, William)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Brief in Support of Defendants Shapiro and Brown LLP's Motion To Dismiss filed by Shapiro & Brown, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b)(Savage, William)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. 3, is DENIED. A copy of this Order was sent to plaintiff as DIRECTED on 1.17.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/17/2019. (epri, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Walter Michael Kurgan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(epri, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Shapiro & Brown, LLP, U.S. Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Shapiro & Brown, LLP, U.S. Bank NA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683040614.), filed by Walter Michael Kurgan. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurgan v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Brown, LLP
Represented By: William Mapp Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Michael Kurgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?