NEWBAUER v. JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC. et al

Plaintiff: CARSON NEWBAUER
Defendant: TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., JACKSON HEWITT INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC and BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00679
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 46 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay (Docket No. 44) by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC, JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order Extending Responsive Pleading Deadline)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC, JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott McIntosh, #2 Exhibit A (Motion), #3 Exhibit B (Order))(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC, JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 43 Memorandum in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Entry of Order filed by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC, JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Michael Burns as to BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 02/12/2019. (tlev, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Pro hac vice for Abram Jeremy Ellis as to CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 02/12/2019. (tlev, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC., CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC, JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 39 Memorandum in Support re #38 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria McShane, #2 Affidavit of Jeremy Schein, #3 Affidavit of Richard Siegel)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) by JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 11, 2019 Filing 37 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC.. (Neary, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 36 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Michael Burns and Certification of Local Counsel John M. Neary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6488984. by BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC.. (Neary, John)
February 11, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Neary on behalf of BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC. (Neary, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 34 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC. (Terzaken, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abram Jeremy Ellis and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan D. Porter Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6485666. by CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC. (Porter, Jonathan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Porter on behalf of CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC (Porter, Jonathan)
February 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John Francis Terzaken, III on behalf of CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC (Terzaken, John)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jason Scott Hartley as to CARSON NEWBAUER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 1/30/19. (tlev, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION for Entry of Order filed by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Entry of Order by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 25 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Scott Hartley and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6464160. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 22, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARSON NEWBAUER BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC. served on 1/8/2019. (dcou, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants: ORDERED that all Defendants' respective responses to the Complaint is extended up to and including March 1, 2019. No Defendant will raise an objection of service to this matter, but Defendants reserve all other defenses and objections to the Complaint, including the court's Jurisdiction and the venue of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/22/2019. (dcou, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice for Richard Monroe Paul, III as to CARSON NEWBAUER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 1/18/19. (tlev, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 21 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (McIntosh, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by JACKSON HEWITT INC., JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC., TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Monroe Paul III and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6451527. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by CARSON NEWBAUER (Notice of Association of Counsel) (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARSON NEWBAUER CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC served on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dcou, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARSON NEWBAUER JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC. served on 1/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dcou, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joseph R Saveri as to CARSON NEWBAUER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 1/10/19. (tlev, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jiamin Chen as to CARSON NEWBAUER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 1/10/19. (tlev, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Steven Noel Williams as to CARSON NEWBAUER. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 1/10/19. (tlev, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARSON NEWBAUER JACKSON HEWITT INC. served on 12/28/2018.(dcou, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CARSON NEWBAUER TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC. served on 12/28/2018. (dcou, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jiamin Chen and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6438913. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Noel Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6438902. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Richard Saveri and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6438873. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CARSON NEWBAUER. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Judge's Procedures)(dcou, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Summons for Corsair Capital, LLC) by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Summons for Bayside Capital, Inc. by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Summons for Tax Services of America, Inc.) by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Summons for Jackson Hewitt Inc.) by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (Summons for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.) by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Shumadine, Conrad)
December 21, 2018 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to use upper and lower-case letters to input names on the docket sheet in future filings. (epri, )
December 20, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint (Class Action) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6418177.), filed by CARSON NEWBAUER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shumadine, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEWBAUER v. JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAX SERVICES OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON HEWITT TAX SERVICE INC.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON HEWITT INC.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORSAIR CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan David Porter
Represented By: John Francis Terzaken, III
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYSIDE CAPITAL, INC.
Represented By: James Michael Burns
Represented By: John Michael Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARSON NEWBAUER
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Richard Monroe Paul, III
Represented By: Jiamin Chen
Represented By: Joseph R Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?