Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc. v. Arch Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.
Defendant: Arch Insurance Group
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Watermark Environmental, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00681
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint/third party complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(clou)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons re #13 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint against Hartford Fire Insurance Company by Watermark Environmental, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hartford Fire Insurance Company by Watermark Environmental, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract)(Pocock, Donald)
February 8, 2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 3/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room. (lbax, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 12:30 PM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 2/4/19. (lbax, )
January 30, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (clou)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Arch Insurance Group. (Pocock, Donald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Watermark Environmental, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Defendant Watermark Environmental Inc.'s, COUNTERCLAIM against Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc. by Watermark Environmental, Inc., Arch Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract)(Pocock, Donald)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Richard Pocock on behalf of Arch Insurance Group, Watermark Environmental, Inc. (Pocock, Donald)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc. All Defendants (clou )
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Summons Arch Insurance Group, Attachments: #1 Summons Watermark Environmental Inc., #2 Civil Motions Procedures)(clou)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc. re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Gordon, Jesse)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.. (Gordon, Jesse)
December 21, 2018 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to refile the Summonses and Financial Disclosure Statement as separate docket entries and to refile the Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable pdf form. (epri, )
December 21, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6419724.), filed by Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Gordon, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc. v. Arch Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Watermark Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith & Keene Electric Service, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse Brian Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Group
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?