JTH Tax Inc. v. Yecke et al

Plaintiff: JTH Tax Inc.
Defendant: Brenda Yecke, Mary V Wilson and Second Wind Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00019
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #15 Notice of Settlement: The court has been advised that this matter is settled. At the direction of the court, we must notify you that the matter will be dismissed agreed with prejudice unless an otherwise appropriate dismissal order is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of court obtained by counsel.If this matter requires court approval of the settlement, you should arrange an appropriate date for a hearing on settlement approval with the assigned judges calendar clerk. The court appreciates your giving this matter your prompt attention. (dcou, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement Jointly Filed by Second Wind Group, Inc., Mary V Wilson, Brenda Yecke (Harris, Andrea)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Clair Harris on behalf of Second Wind Group, Inc., Mary V Wilson, Brenda Yecke (Harris, Andrea)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' time to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including Monday, March 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 2/20/2019. (dcou, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of re #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Oral Argument (Joint) by Second Wind Group, Inc., Mary V Wilson, Brenda Yecke (Powers, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Second Wind Group, Inc., Mary V Wilson, Brenda Yecke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powers, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Franklin Powers on behalf of Second Wind Group, Inc., Mary V Wilson, Brenda Yecke (Powers, Robert)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Hearing by JTH Tax Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order (Burns, Patrick)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax Inc. All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summ Returned Executed - B. Yeck, #2 Summ Returned Executed - M. Wilson, #3 Letter)(dcou, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Peter G. Siachos as to JTH Tax Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 1/24/19. (tlev, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick K. Burns Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6456039. by JTH Tax Inc.. (Burns, Patrick)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by JTH Tax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JTH Tax Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Motions Procedure)(dcou, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by JTH Tax Inc.. (Whitelock, Julia)
January 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JTH Tax Inc.. (Whitelock, Julia)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6439267.), filed by JTH Tax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Whitelock, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax Inc. v. Yecke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Yecke
Represented By: Andrea Clair Harris
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary V Wilson
Represented By: Andrea Clair Harris
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Wind Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Clair Harris
Represented By: Robert Franklin Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax Inc.
Represented By: Julia Kim Whitelock
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Burns
Represented By: Peter G. Siachos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?