Robinson v. Jackson Hewitt, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Robinson
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc. and Tax Services of America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00044
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 30 Motion Hearing before District Judge Robert G. Doumar held on 3/14/2019 re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc. Appearances: Conrad M. Shumadine, Jason S. Hartley, Joseph R. Saveri and Richard M. Paul, III for the Plaintiffs. Scott A. McIntosh and Jonathan P. Labukas for the Defendants. Motion hearing re 38 , #11 , #12 and #22 Motions to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division). Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court continues the STAY in these cases until the Court enters a decision concerning venue. No further motions can be filed in any of the four cases without leave of court. The Court will issue a written opinion explaining its ruling in more detail. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
March 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re #28 NOTICE: Attorney notified that leave of Court is needed to file this document. (bpet, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority (Doc. No. 28) (with Incorporated Memorandum) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Submission of Supplemental Authority), #2 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
March 11, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Jessica Robinson re #25 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Opinion) (Shumadine, Conrad) Modified text on 3/12/19 (bpet, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 Rebuttal Brief re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Victoria McShane)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel Elvin Gustafson as to Jessica Robinson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/28/19. (tlev, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 25 Opposition to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 22, 2019 Filing 24 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Jessica Robinson. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.; Jackson Hewitt, Inc.; and Tax Services of America, Inc., accept service as of 2/22/19. (bpet, )
February 22, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER. #18 Motion to Stay is GRANTED and this action is stayed pending resolution of #12 Motion to Transfer; #6 Motion to Consolidate and #8 Motion for Entry of Case Management Order are HELD IN ABEYANCE. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the courtroom deputy w/in 7 days to schedule a hearing on the #12 Motion to Transfer. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/20/19. (bpet, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 Rebuttal Brief re #8 MOTION entry of Case Management Order (Motion for Entry of Order) filed by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 Rebuttal Brief re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott McIntosh, #2 Exhibit A (Motion), #3 Exhibit B (Order))(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION entry of Case Management Order (Motion for Entry of Order) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Elvin Gustafson and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6493531. by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tax Services of America, Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria McShane)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amanda Marie Williams as to Jessica Robinson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/8/19. (bpet, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Marie Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6482160. by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION entry of Case Management Order (Motion for Entry of Order) filed by Jessica Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION entry of Case Management Order (Motion for Entry of Order) by Jessica Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Jessica Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) by Jessica Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt, Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Tax Services of America, Inc. by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Jackson Hewitt, Inc. by Jessica Robinson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6461478.), filed by Jessica Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shumadine, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Jackson Hewitt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Robinson
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Represented By: Daniel Elvin Gustafson
Represented By: Amanda Marie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?