Gibson v. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nicole Gibson
Defendant: Tax Services of America, Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc., Corsair Capital, LLC and Bayside Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00049
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Case transferred to District of New Jersey, Newark Division. (bpet, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION AND ORDER granting #22 Motion to Transfer Case. Case TRANSFERRED to U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, Newark Division. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 3/28/19. (bpet, )
March 20, 2019 Notice of Correction re #47 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #40 NOTICE: Unfortunately when you filed document numbers #40 , #46 and #47 you needed leave of court to file the document. The proposed document should have been an attachment to the motion. Please refile the motion and the proposed document as an attachment to the motion. (dcou, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 48 Motion Hearing before District Judge Robert G. Doumar held on 3/14/2019 re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc. Appearances: Conrad M. Shumadine, Jason S. Hartley, Joseph R. Saveri and Richard M. Paul, III for the Plaintiffs. Scott A. McIntosh and Jonathan P. Labukas for the Defendants. Motion hearing re #38 , #11 , #12 and #22 Motions to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division). Arguments of counsel. Comments of Court. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court continues the STAY in these cases until the Court enters a decision concerning venue. No further motions can be filed in any of the four cases without leave of court. The Court will issue a written opinion explaining its ruling in more detail. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (as to Defendant Corsair Capital, LLC) by Nicole Gibson (Shumadine, Conrad)
March 13, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant, Bayside Capital, Inc. by Nicole Gibson (Shumadine, Conrad)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Michael Burns as to Bayside Capital, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 3/13/19. (tlev, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority (Doc. No. 40) (with Incorporated Memorandum) by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority), #2 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
March 13, 2019 Filing 43 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James M. Burns and Certification of Local Counsel John M. Neary by Bayside Capital, Inc.. (Neary, John)
March 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re #41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James M. Burns and Certification of Local Counsel John M. Neary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6536066. The motion does not contain the signature block of the applicant. The motion is also missing words within the document. Counsel should refile the motion with the noted corrections. Counsel should not pay a second filing fee. (tlev, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Miktus on behalf of Bayside Capital, Inc. (Miktus, Daniel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 41 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James M. Burns and Certification of Local Counsel John M. Neary Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6536066. by Bayside Capital, Inc.. (Neary, John)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Nicole Gibson re #38 Opposition (Plaintiffs' Submision of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(Shumadine, Conrad)
March 4, 2019 Filing 39 Rebuttal Brief re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Victoria McShane)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 26, 2019 Filing 38 Opposition to #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 25, 2019 Filing 37 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bayside Capital, Inc.. (Neary, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Neary on behalf of Bayside Capital, Inc. (Neary, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nicole Gibson. Corsair Capital, LCC, accepts service as of 2/25/19. (bpet, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 34 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nicole Gibson. Bayside Capital, Inc., accepts service as of 2/22/19. (bpet, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 33 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Nicole Gibson. Jackson Hewitt Inc.; Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.; and Tax Services of America, Inc., accept service as of 2/22/19. (bpet, )
February 22, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Grand Jury Courtroom before District Judge Robert G. Doumar. (lbax, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER: granting #27 Motion to Stay; HELD IN ABEYANCE on #8 Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation and #10 Motion for Entry of Case Management Order. The parties are DIRECTED to contact the courtroom deputy, Lori Baxter, at (757)222-7244, within seven (7) days of the date hereof to schedule a hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer (ECF No. 22). See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/20/2019. Copies distributed as directed. (dcou, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 Rebuttal Brief re #10 MOTION entry of Case Management Order filed by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 Rebuttal Brief re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott McIntosh, #2 Exhibit A (Motion), #3 Exhibit B (Order))(McIntosh, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #10 MOTION entry of Case Management Order filed by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tax Services of America, Inc., Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.. (McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) filed by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Victoria McShane, #2 Affidavit of Jeremy Schein, #3 Affidavit of Richard Siegel)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey (Newark Division) by Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McIntosh, Scott)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Brian Michael Hogan as to Nicole Gibson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/6/19. (bpet, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Henry London as to Nicole Gibson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/6/19. (bpet, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Douglas Andrew Millen as to Nicole Gibson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/6/19. (bpet, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Alex Straus as to Nicole Gibson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/6/19. (bpet, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Tina Wolfson as to Nicole Gibson. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 2/6/19. (bpet, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Michael Hogan and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6478709. by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 5, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Andrew Millen and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6478696. by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Henry London and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6478692. by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 5, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Straus and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6477592. by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tina Wolfson and Certification of Local Counsel Conrad M. Shumadine Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6477587. by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION entry of Case Management Order filed by Nicole Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION entry of Case Management Order by Nicole Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Robert G. Doumar. District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) filed by Nicole Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Motion for Reassignment and Consolidation Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 42(a)) by Nicole Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shumadine, Conrad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Five (5) Summonses Issued as to Bayside Capital, Inc., Corsair Capital, LLC, Jackson Hewitt Inc., Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., Tax Services of America, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 28, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (for Corsair Capital, LLC) by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (for Bayside Capital, Inc.) by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (for Tax Services of America, Inc.) by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (for Jackson Hewitt Inc.) by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (for Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.) by Nicole Gibson. (Shumadine, Conrad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6465271.), filed by Nicole Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shumadine, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Gibson
Represented By: Conrad Moss Shumadine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Services of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Hewitt Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayside Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?