Lancaster et al v. Secretary of the Navy et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Dufour, Andrew Calhoun, Timothy Demy, Denise Y. Merritt, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Michael Lavelle, Armando Torralva, Michael Belt, George W. Linzey, Martha Carson, Jairo Moreno, James Looby, Rick P. Bradley, David Mitchell, David S. Wilder, Daniel Roysden, Richard Arnold, Furniss Harkness, Alan Garner, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, William C. Blair, John Gordy, Barby Earl Wilson, Walker Marsh, Jr. and Mary Helen Spalding
Defendant: The Secretary of the Navy, The Chief of Naval Personnel and The Navy Chief of Chaplains
Case Number: 2:2019cv00095
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay , Modify Pretrial Order, and for Protective Order by The Secretary of the Navy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Agreed))(Hartlieb, Garry)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Correction, Pro Hac Vice Application by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry)
April 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb . The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Eric Wilson on behalf of The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy (Wilson, Joel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Hearing by The Secretary of the Navy re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Hartlieb, Garry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate and AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Sec. of Navy, Chief of Naval Personnel, Navy Chief of Chaplains on 03/07/2019, filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 3 Issued Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 USPS for Sec. of Navy, #3 Exhibit 3 USPS US Aty EDVA, #4 Exhibit 4 USPS US AG)(Schulcz, Arthur)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/16/19. (lbax, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service re #1 Complaint,,,, by Garry D. Hartlieb on behalf of All Defendants (Hartlieb, Garry)
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Errata for Exhibit 2 re #1 Complaint by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 2)(Schulcz, Arthur) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (clou ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Schulcz, Arthur)
March 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6517015.), filed by Alan Garner, Jairo Moreno, Andrew Calhoun, Armando Torralva, Barby Earl Wilson, James Looby, Edith Rene' Porter-Stewart, Allen L Lancaster, Walker Marsh Jr, Rafael J. Quiles, George W. Linzey, Furniss Harkness, David S. Wilder, Mary Helen Spalding, Rick P Bradley, Richard Arnold, Timothy Demy, John Gordy, David Mitchell, Thomas Klappert, Michael Lavelle, Martha Carson, Michael Belt, Daniel Roysden, Denise Y Merritt, Joseph Dufour, William C Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Pls Retaliation Claims, #2 Exhibit 2 Leuba 38 Yrs, #3 Exhibit 3 CHC Blackball Machine, #4 Exhibit 4 RADM Black's NIG Test, #5 Exhibit 5 Washburn NIG Testimony, #6 Exhibit 6 CHC Bd Mbrs Denom, #7 Exhibit 7 Dickerson Decl, #8 Exhibit 8 Stafford Report, #9 Exhibit 9 Demy Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 Gary Heinke Decl, #11 Exhibit 11 Ellis Report, #12 Exhibit 12 CNA Denom Prom %, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulcz, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Secretary of the Navy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dufour
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Calhoun
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Demy
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Y. Merritt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Porter-Stewart
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael J. Quiles
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lavelle
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Torralva
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Belt
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Linzey
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Carson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jairo Moreno
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Looby
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick P. Bradley
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mitchell
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Wilder
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Roysden
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Arnold
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furniss Harkness
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Garner
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Klappert
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen L. Lancaster
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Blair
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gordy
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barby Earl Wilson
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker Marsh, Jr.
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Helen Spalding
Represented By: Arthur Andrew Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Secretary of the Navy
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chief of Naval Personnel
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Navy Chief of Chaplains
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Represented By: Garry D. Hartlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?