Ivy v. T-Mobile US, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Ivy
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc., John Doe #2, John Doe #1, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Dayton Q and Jay H.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration regarding oral argument (Ellenson, James)
July 1, 2019 Notice of Correction re #12 MOTION to Strike - this Document was filed using the wrong docket event. The "Motion To Strike" was incorrectly filed as "Answer." The Clerk's Office staff corrected this error. No further action is required at this time. (afar)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Ellenson, James) Modified text and document type on 7/1/2019 (afar).
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ellenson, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jason Ivy. (Theuer, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jason Ivy.(Theuer, James)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for James Blaker Baldinger as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 05/28/19. (tlev, )
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amanda Romfh Jesteadt as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 05/28/19. (tlev, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 memo of law in support of motion, #2 Exhibit, #3 corporate disclosure statement)(Ellenson, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Blaker Baldinger and Certification of Local Counsel James Ellenson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6642344. by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ellenson, James)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Romfh Jesteadt and Certification of Local Counsel James Ellenson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6642342. by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ellenson, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
May 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ellenson, James)
May 10, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal: Document number 1 does not contain a Civil Cover Sheet. Please file a civil cover sheet as soon as possible. (afar)
May 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (afar)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6633298.), filed by T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ellenson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivy v. T-Mobile US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: James Stephen Ellenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Stephen Ellenson
Represented By: Amanda Romfh Jesteadt
Represented By: James Blaker Baldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayton Q
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Ivy
Represented By: James Richard Theuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?