South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC
Defendant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00256
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc..(Grace, Kathryn)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Conrod, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Conrod, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for United States of America by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. (Conrod, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc. by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. (Conrod, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. (Conrod, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 1-C, #4 Exhibit 1-D, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9)(Conrod, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, )
May 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6641905.), filed by South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Conrod, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Norfolk Jordan Bridge, LLC
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?