Whitaker v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Susan Loretta Whitaker
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00269
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security General Counsel and the Attorney General of the United States served on 5/6/2019 (afar)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney for Nancy Berryhill served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM Form 285)(tamarm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, filed by Susan Loretta Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(epri, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to issue summons in this action and prepare three packets containing a summons, a copy of the Complaint, and this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to deliver these packets to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summons, Complaint, and this Order on the Attorney General of the United States, the United States Attorney, and the Social Security Administration, in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 (i)(2). A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 6.5.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 6/5/2019. (epri, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Loretta Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachments)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Loretta Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?