Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C" v. Triorient LLC
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C"
Defendant: Triorient LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00297
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Triorient LLC.(Brogan, Patrick)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Triorient LLC to file their answer within 5 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 7/15/19. ENTERED AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (bpet, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Triorient LLC. (Brogan, Patrick)
July 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (bpet, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Triorient LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer)(Brogan, Patrick)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's NOTICE to Counsel for answer status. Reply requested within 15 days. (bpet, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C"; Triorient LLC served effective 6/13/19 per Code of VA 8.01-326.1. (bpet, ) Modified service date on 6/28/19 (bpet, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Triorient LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil motions procedures) (bpet, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C". (Sump, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Harlen Sump on behalf of Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C" (Sump, David)
June 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C". (Burke, William)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6673468.), filed by Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C". (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Original Contract, #3 Exhibit B - First Amendment, #4 Exhibit C - Second Amendment, #5 Exhibit D - Third Amendment, #6 Exhibit E - Fourth Amendment, #7 Exhibit F - Fifth Amendment, #8 Exhibit G - Shortfall Notice, #9 Exhibit H - Delinquency Notice)(Burke, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C" v. Triorient LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. "C"
Represented By: David Harlen Sump
Represented By: William Andrew McNinch Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triorient LLC
Represented By: Patrick Michael Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?