Clemmons v. Regent University et al
Plaintiff: Millionnetta Clemmons
Defendant: Jana Nattermann, Regent University and Martha Smith
Case Number: 2:2019cv00301
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jana Nattermann, waiver sent on 6/20/2019; Regent University, waiver sent on 6/20/2019; Martha Smith, waiver sent on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ad Plaintiff's email address to this case, and docket this ORDER in the court's electronic filing system. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 7/3/19. (copy mailed 7/5/19) (afar)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Millionnetta Clemmons. (epri, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Jana Nattermann, Regent University, Martha Smith, filed by Millionnetta Clemmons.(afar)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is Directed to file Plaintiff's Complaint. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service form for Defendants. (see order for details) If any Defendant fails to waive service, the Clerk is DIRECTED to (i) issue summons, (ii) prepare a packet containing a summons, a copy of the complaint, and this order for any such Defendant, and (iii) deliver the packet to the U.S. Marshal, who is Directed to serve the packet upon any such Defendant. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 6/20/19. (copy mailed 6/20/19) (afar)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Millionnetta Clemmons. (afar)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is DENIED. If Plaintiff would like the court to consider her submission, she is DIRECTED to either: (i) remit the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee, or (ii) submit a clear and complete IFP Application to the court for consideration within thirty days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, along with a copy of the court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), to Plaintiff. Documents sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 6.11.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 6/11/2019. (epri, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Millionnetta Clemmons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemmons v. Regent University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millionnetta Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Nattermann
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regent University
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?