AdvanSix, Inc. v. M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem, et al
Plaintiff: AdvanSix, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon Navigation Co., Ltd., in personam, Tide Line, Inc., in personam and M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem
Case Number: 2:2019cv00310
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AdvanSix, Inc.. Amazon Navigation Co., Ltd., in personam waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Sump, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AdvanSix, Inc.. Tide Line, Inc., in personam waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Sump, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AdvanSix, Inc.. M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Sump, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 Letter of Undertaking BOND (Collateral Receipt #194913) in the amount of $2,500,000.00 posted in the matter of AdvanSix, Inc. re: M/V "amazon", IMO NO. 9138616, etc. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(afar)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving Security re #11 MOTION filed by AdvanSix, Inc.. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 6/19/19. (afar)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO APPROVE SECURITY by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revised Letter of Undertaking, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Sump, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Tide Line, Inc., in personam. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Motions Notice)(afar)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Amazon Navigation Co., Ltd., in personam. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Motions Notice)(afar)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motions Notice)(afar)
June 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons to Tide Line, Inc. by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Amazon Navigation Co., Ltd. by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT for Service of Process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT For Service of Process on the Secretary of the Commonwealth by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Sump, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (VERIFIED COMPLAINT) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6684819.), filed by AdvanSix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Undertaking, #2 Exhibit 2 - AdvanSix Terminal Rules, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sump, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AdvanSix, Inc. v. M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Navigation Co., Ltd., in personam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tide Line, Inc., in personam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V "AMAZON", (IMO No. 9138616, Official No. 732165) her gear, tackle, apparel, engines, and appurtenances, in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AdvanSix, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Garrett Guthrie
Represented By: David Harlen Sump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?