Crawl Space Door System, Inc. v. Smartvent Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Crawl Space Door System, Inc.
Defendant: Smartvent Products, Inc., Sylro Sales Corp. and Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00320
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Byers, Duncan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc.. (Giles, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Giles, Nicholas)
July 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re #17 Affidavit of Service, #16 Affidavit of Service. Attorney notified that the Summons returns need to be filed with the Affidavits of Service filed as attachments to the Summons returns.(tamarm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc. c/o Thomas S. Little as Registered Agent on 6/21/2019, filed by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Smart Vent Products, Inc. c/o Thomas S. Little as Authorized Agent on 6/21/2019, filed by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Brent Justus on behalf of Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc. (Justus, Johnny)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Giles on behalf of Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc. (Giles, Nicholas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crawl Space Door System, Inc. re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Byers, Duncan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Sylro Sales Corp. trading as Sunvent Industries by Crawl Space Door System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Byers, Duncan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Smart Vent Products, Inc. and Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc.'s Unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc. answer due 8/2/2019; Smartvent Products, Inc. answer due 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 07/03/2019. (tamarm)
July 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Krask. #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (tamarm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smartvent Products, Inc.. (Schaeffer, Seth)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Seth)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc., Smartvent Products, Inc., Sylro Sales Corp.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar)
June 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (afar)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Crawl Space Door System, Inc.. (Byers, Duncan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6696184.), filed by Crawl Space Door System, Inc..(Byers, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawl Space Door System, Inc. v. Smartvent Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crawl Space Door System, Inc.
Represented By: Duncan Glover Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smartvent Products, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas James Giles
Represented By: Johnny Brent Justus
Represented By: Seth Abram Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylro Sales Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Reduction Plus Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas James Giles
Represented By: Johnny Brent Justus
Represented By: Seth Abram Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?