BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers and HOFD Ashville Park, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00323
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 INTERVENER'S ANSWER to Complaint by HOFD Ashville Park, LLC.(Berkley, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant filed by HOFD Ashville Park, LLC. (Berkley, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by HOFD Ashville Park, LLC. (Berkley, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate Reporting Service by United States Army Corps of Engineers. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wilson, Joel)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Administrative Record by United States Army Corps of Engineers.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Joel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 (Kahle, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND WITHDRAWING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Having reviewed the Joint Motion for Entry of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and for good cause, that motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 2) is withdrawn without prejudice. See Order for deadlines. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/10/2019. (dcou, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristofor R. Swanson as certified by local counsel Joel E. Wilson for the United States Army Corps of Engineers. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/9/2019. (Allen, Arenda)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristofor R. Swanson and Certification of Local Counsel Joel E. Wilson by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Wilson, Joel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD. United States Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019 (Kahle, Douglas)
July 2, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 Certificate of Service: Unfortunately, document number 7 was filed using the wrong event. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed. Please refile the document. (dcou, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD. re #5 Summons Issued, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States (Kahle, Douglas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Eric Wilson on behalf of United States Army Corps of Engineers (Wilson, Joel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Judges' Procedure for Civil Motions)(dcou, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.. (Kahle, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Brief in Support to #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.. (Kahle, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.. (Kahle, Douglas)
June 21, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: The Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support should be docketed separately on the record. Please refile these documents. (afar)
June 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (afar)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6701814.), filed by BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(Kahle, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD. v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BACK BAY RESTORATION FOUNDATION, LTD.
Represented By: Douglas Eugene Kahle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Joel Eric Wilson
Represented By: Kristofor R. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFD Ashville Park, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Saunders Berkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?