GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. v. G&S Supply, LLC et al

Plaintiff: GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory S. Spires, Thomas Hayes, Greer Group, LLC, Gregory K. Spires, County Roads, LLC, Wayne Side, Mike Welton, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer and Westly L. Greer
Case Number: 2:2019cv00324
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1831
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 65 Rebuttal Brief re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1)(Lascara, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 64 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction (Post-Hearing) filed by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 63 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction Post Hearing filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Lascara, William)
August 6, 2019 Filing 62 Declaration of Chris Morton by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24)(Wilson, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 61 Memorandum in Support re #60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wayne Side. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McFarland, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Wayne Side. (McFarland, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff to file Post-Hearing Memorandum by 8/6/19; Defendants to file Post-Hearing Memorandum by 8/13/19; and Plaintiff to file rebuttal by 8/16/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 8/6/19. (bpet, )
August 6, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: #56 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Memorandum. (bpet, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 56 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Memorandum by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lascara, William)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7-29-2019, before Judge Rebecca Beach Smith, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019.(stewart, jody)
August 2, 2019 Filing 54 .TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7-26-2019, before Judge Rebecca Beach Smith, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019.(stewart, jody)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7-25-2019, before Judge Rebecca Beach Smith, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2019.(stewart, jody)
July 29, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith: Jody Stewart, OCR. Counsel and parties present. Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Defendants presented evidence through Declarations of Westly L. Greer, Gregory K. Spires, Thomas Hayes, Jr., Michael Welton, Wayne Side, Gregory S. Spires, and Sabrina Greer (Declarations attached to ECF no. 43, filed by defendants), and the court directed that the Declarations be admitted as evidence. The court directed counsel for plaintiff to file follow-up brief with any law cited by August 5, 2019; any response by defendants shall be due by August 12, 2019; any reply shall be due by August 16, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Witness List, #2 Exhibit List) (sche)
July 26, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith: Jody Stewart, OCR. Counsel and parties present. Continuation of Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Plaintiff continued presenting evidence. Court advised counsel and the parties that the hearing was proceeding under Rule 65a (preliminary injunction). The court advised counsel that witness Chris Morton may be recalled. Plaintiff rested. Defendants oral motion to deny preliminary injunction. The court denied the motion for the reasons stated on the record. Motion Hearing continued to 7/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 1 before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith. (sche)
July 26, 2019 Motion Hearing continued to 7/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 1 before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction. (sche)
July 25, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith: Jody Stewart, OCR. William Lascara, Jeffrey Wilson, and Jesse Gordon present on behalf of plaintiff. Robert McFarland and Jeanne Noonan present on behalf of all defendants. Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2019 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Motion to separate witnesses, Granted. Opening statements of counsel heard. Evidence presented by plaintiff. Hearing continued to July 26, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. (sche)
July 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re #48 MOTION to Seal Exhibit, #49 NOTICE: The filing user has been instructed to file the document proposed to be sealed using the appropriate Sealed Document event. Additionally, they were informed of the proper event to use when filing the Rule 5 sealing notice. (bpet, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. re #48 MOTION to Seal Exhibit (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 7/25/19 (bpet, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Seal Exhibit and Memorandum in Support by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified docket text on 7/25/19 (bpet, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 47 Declaration of Gary Pate by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2, #6 Exhibit D part 3, #7 Exhibit D part 4)(Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 46 Declaration of Amber Wenrick by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2)(Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to File Responses Out of Time. Defendants to file opposition by 7/23/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/22/19. (bpet, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Certification of Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 6S(b)(l){B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery From Defendants served on Gregory S. Spires on June 27, 2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: #42 MOTION for Leave to File Responses Out of Time. (bpet, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 43 Memorandum in Support re #42 MOTION for Leave to File Responses Out of Time filed by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A to Opposition, #3 Exhibit B to Opposition, #4 Exhibit C to Opposition, #5 Exhibit D to Opposition, #6 Exhibit E to Opposition, #7 Exhibit F to Opposition, #8 Exhibit G to Opposition, #9 Exhibit H to Opposition, #10 Exhibit Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery)(McFarland, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Responses Out of Time by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McFarland, Robert)
July 17, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Legal Relief; Exhibit 1; Exhibit 2;Exhibit 3; Exhibit 4; Exhibit 5; Exhibit 6; Exhibit 7; Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 1 O; Exhibit 11; Exhibit 12 served on Greer Group, LLC (Sabrina Greer) on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Notice of Correction re #25 Summons Returned Executed, #37 Affidavit of Service: the summons return filed at #25 does not contain a date served. Additionally, the docket text of the #37 Affidavit of service indicates service on Greer Group, LLC via Sabrina Greer; however the document at #37 relates to defendant Westly Greer. The filing user has been instructed to refile proof of service as to Greer Group, LLC. (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Motion for Expedited Discovery and Memo in Support thereof, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Memo in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and a Certification in Support of a Temporary Restraining Order served on Wayne Side on 06/27/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit 1.1; Exhibit 1.2; Exhibit 1.3; Exhibit 1.4; Exhibit 1.5; Exhibit 1.6; Exhibit 1.7; Exhibit 1.8; Exhibit 1.9; Certification of Plaintiffs Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(1)(B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery from Defendants served on Sabrina Greer on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Legal Relief; Exhibit 1; Exhibit 2; Exhibit 3; Exhibit 4; Exhibit 5; Exhibit 6; Exhibit 7; Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 1 O; Exhibit 11; Exhibit 12 served on Sabrina Greer on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Legal Relief; Exhibit 1; Exhibit 2; Exhibit 3; Exhibit 4; Exhibit 5; Exhibit 6; Exhibit 7; Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 1 O; Exhibit 11; Exhibit 12 served on Greer Group, LLC (Sabrina Greer) on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit 1.1; Exhibit 1.2; Exhibit 1.3; Exhibit 1.4; Exhibit 1.5; Exhibit 1.6; Exhibit 1.7; Exhibit 1.8; Exhibit 1.9; Certification of Plaintiffs Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(1)(B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery from Defendants served on Greer Group, LLC (Sabrina Greer) on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit 1.1; Exhibit 1.2; Exhibit 1.3; Exhibit 1.4; Exhibit 1.5; Exhibit 1.6; Exhibit 1.7; Exhibit 1.8; Exhibit 1.9; Certification of Plaintiffs Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(1)(B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery from Defendants served on Westly L. Greer on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Legal Relief; Exhibit 1; Exhibit 2; Exhibit 3; Exhibit 4; Exhibit 5; Exhibit 6; Exhibit 7; Exhibit 8; Exhibit 9; Exhibit 1 O; Exhibit 11; Exhibit 12 served on Westly L. Greer on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit 1.1; Exhibit 1.2; Exhibit 1.3; Exhibit 1.4; Exhibit 1.5; Exhibit 1.6; Exhibit 1.7; Exhibit 1.8; Exhibit 1.9; Certification of Plaintiffs Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(1)(B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery From Defendants served on Gregory K. Spires on 06/27/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Exhibit 1.1; Exhibit 1.2; Exhibit 1.3; Exhibit 1.4; Exhibit 1.5; Exhibit 1.6; Exhibit 1.7; Exhibit 1.8; Exhibit 1.9; Certification of Plaintiffs Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(1)(B); Plaintiff GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Motion for Expedited Discovery; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants; GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Expedited Interrogatories to Defendants; Plaintiff's GMS Industrial Supply, lnc.'s Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Expedited Discovery From Defendants served on G&S Supply, LLC (Westly L. Greer) on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Verified Complaint served on G&S Supply, LLC (Westly L. Greer) on 06/29/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Motion for Expedited Discovery; Memorandum in Support of TRO and Preliminary Injunction; proposed Order regarding Expedited Discovery served on Country Roads, LLC (Gregory K. Spires) on 06/27/2019, filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Gregory S. Spires served on 6/27/2019. (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified service date on 7/17/19 (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Mike Welton served on 6/26/2019. (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified service date on 7/17/19 (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Thomas Hayes served on 6/27/2019. (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified service date on 7/17/19 (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. Gregory K. Spires served on 6/27/2019. (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified service date on 7/17/19 (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. County Roads, LLC served on 6/27/2019. (Wilson, Jeffrey) Modified service date on 7/17/19 (bpet, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER clarifying that the extension granted in ECF 23 applies to defendants' response to the complaint, due by 8/6/19, whether that be an answer or a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/17/19. (bpet, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. For good cause shown and in light of the length of the complaint and the various claims asserted, defendants' time for filing responsive pleadings is extended to not later than August 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 07/16/2019. (Krask, Robert)
July 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. (bpet, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The Court ORDERS defendants to file any reply no later than 9:00 a.m. on 7/17/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 7/16/19. (bpet, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Lascara, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Greer Group, LLC. (McFarland, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by G&S Supply, LLC. (McFarland, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by County Roads, LLC. (McFarland, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing reset for 7/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 1 before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (bpet, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue the Temporary Restraining Order Hearing. The hearing is continued to 7/25/19 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 7/11/19. (bpet, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Continue the Temporary Restraining Order Hearing filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2)(Lascara, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue the Temporary Restraining Order Hearing by County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton. (McFarland, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan on behalf of County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton (Noonan, Jeanne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William McFarland on behalf of County Roads, LLC, G&S Supply, LLC, Sabrina Greer, Westly L. Greer, Greer Group, LLC, Thomas Hayes, Wayne Side, Gregory K. Spires, Gregory S. Spires, Mike Welton (McFarland, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction, #3 Memorandum in Support, (Lascara, William)
June 28, 2019 Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 1 before District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (sche)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil motions procedures) (bpet, )
June 22, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Requests For Preliminary Injunction, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Lascara, William)
June 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Requests For Preliminary Injunction by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lascara, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B) re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction, #3 Memorandum in Support by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. (Lascara, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Main Document 4 rotated to upright position on 6/21/19) (bpet, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1)(Lascara, William) (Attachment 1 replaced with redacted version on 6/26/19) (bpet, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lascara, William)
June 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (afar)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6702633.), filed by GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit #1, #3 Exhibit #2, #4 Exhibit #3, #5 Exhibit #4, #6 Exhibit #5, #7 Exhibit #6, #8 Exhibit #7, #9 Exhibit #8, #10 Exhibit #9, #11 Exhibit #10, #12 Exhibit #11, #13 Exhibit #12)(Lascara, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GMS Industrial Supply, Inc. v. G&S Supply, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Spires
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hayes
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greer Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory K. Spires
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Roads, LLC
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Side
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Welton
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&S Supply, LLC
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Greer
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westly L. Greer
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Robert William McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMS Industrial Supply, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Lascara
Represented By: Jeffrey Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?