City of Portsmouth v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Portsmouth
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., PURDUE PHARMA, L.P., Actavis LLC, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Collegium Pharmaceuticals, inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Beverly Sackler, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Richard Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Kapoor, David Sackler and Kathe Sackler
Case Number: 2:2019cv00331
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 48 Reply , RESPONSE in Support re #37 MOTION to Stay Proceediungs Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. (Block, Benjamin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 47 Opposition to #40 Request for Hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Block, Benjamin)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. ORDERED that, as to all defendants in this case, the time to serve responsive pleadings is extended until 20 days after a decision on remand or 20 days after a decision on transfer, whichever is later. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/15/2019. (clou )
August 9, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Stay Proceediungs Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by City of Portsmouth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cales, James)
August 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (clou )
August 7, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Massie, Wade)
August 5, 2019 Filing 43 Rebuttal Brief re #25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Portsmouth. (Cales, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/05/2019. (Leonard, Lawrence)
August 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Opposition, #25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , #26 Memorandum in Support, (clou )
August 1, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 Opposition, #25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , #26 Memorandum in Support, by City of Portsmouth. (Cales, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 40 Request for Hearing by City of Portsmouth re #25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court (Cales, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 39 Brief in Support to #37 MOTION to Stay Proceediungs Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. (Block, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 38 Opposition to #25 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Block, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Proceediungs Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Block, Benjamin) Modified on 7/29/2019 : Filing user was directed to re-file Memorandum in Support as a separate docket entry (clou ).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Copies distributed to all counsel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/22/2019. (clou)
July 19, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #33 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney (clou )
July 19, 2019 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #33 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Courtney Lai on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt (Lai, Erica)
July 19, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Substitute Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro hac vice for Danielle Catherine Morello as to Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler and Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/18/19. (tlev, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice for Ronald Franklin Wick as to Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler and Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 07/18/2019. (tlev, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Melissa Helen Maxman as to Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler and Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 07/18/19. (tlev, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 29 JPML Order Reinstating Stay of Conditional Transfer Order : MDL No. 28040. Due to administrative error, the stay of transmittal with regard to Portsmouth was lifted on July 11, 2019, and the action was transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. These circumstances justify reinstatement of the conditional transfer order in order to permit plaintiff to pursue their opposition to transfer. See order for specific details. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel 7/16/2019. (clou)
July 15, 2019 Case transferred to USDC Northern District of Ohio. Case electronically sent to the USDC Northern District of Ohio. (clou )
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Wells Huntington Byrnes on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (Byrnes, Wells)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in Support re #25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Portsmouth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(McGill, Brittany)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Portsmouth. (McGill, Brittany)
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Ashley McGill on behalf of City of Portsmouth (McGill, Brittany)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFIED COPY of MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation, MDL No. 2804, transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel. Certified copy received from Northern District of Ohio and filed in Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division, on July 11, 2019. (clou)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Sackler Defendants and Kapoor are DIRECTED to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 8/20/19. The Court will issue its Rule 26(f) Order only after the parties have filed their pleadings responsive to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/9/19. (bpet, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Danielle Catherine Morello to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Ronald Franklin Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Melissa Helen Maxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Danielle Catherine Morello, #15 Melissa Helen Maxman and #16 Ronald Franklin Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motions do not include the signatures of local counsel. Please re-file the signed motions under the correct event. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joseph Gaughan Cleemann as to City of Portsmouth. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 7/2/19. (tlev, )
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Judith Sarah Scolnick as to City of Portsmouth. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 07/2/19. (tlev, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Danielle Catherine Morello to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Ronald Franklin Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Melissa Helen Maxman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 3, 2019 Notice of Correction re #12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Helen Maxman, #13 Ronald Franklin Wick and #14 Danielle Catherine Morello and Certification of Local Counsel Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley. The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include the written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay the filing fees again. (tlev, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle Catherine Morello and Certification of Local Counsel Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6721247. by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Franklin Wick and Certification of Local Counsel Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6721246. by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Helen Maxman and Certification of Local Counsel Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6721244. by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Dr. John N. Kapoor's Consent Motion to Extend Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (clou )
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Dr. John N. Kapoor's Consent Motion to Extend Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by John Kapoor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Vernon)
July 2, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference (clou )
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Conduct the 26(f) Planning Conference by Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley on behalf of Beverly Sackler, David Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, Kathe Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pitts-Wiley, Ricardo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Gaughan Cleeman and Certification of Local Counsel James A. Cales III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6714047. by City of Portsmouth. (Cales, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Judith Sarah Scolnick and Certification of Local Counsel James A. Cales III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6714031. by City of Portsmouth. (Cales, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Insys Therapeutics, Inc. by City of Portsmouth (Cales, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by McKesson Corporation. (Block, Benjamin)
June 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re 2 Financial Disclosure Statement. The filing user has been notified that document 2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (epri, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to attorney Hardin re: registering as an e-filer. (epri, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to attorney for Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: associating with local counsel. (epri, )
June 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by McKesson Corporation. (Block, Benjamin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6707113.), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Motion to Remand (Denied), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Portsmouth Circuit Court Docket and Pleadings, #5 Appearance of Counsel)(Block, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Portsmouth v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegium Pharmaceuticals, inc.
Represented By: Ryan Hayes Ellis
Represented By: David James Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Wells Huntington Byrnes
Represented By: Ashley Wall Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Myles D'Olivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Paul Jarrett Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jarrett Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Vernon Webster Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Represented By: Ricardo J.A. Pitts-Wiley
Represented By: Erica Courtney Lai
Represented By: Ronald Franklin Wick
Represented By: Melissa Helen Maxman
Represented By: Danielle Catherine Morello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Portsmouth
Represented By: James Arthur Cales, III
Represented By: Judith Sarah Scolnick
Represented By: Joseph Gaughan Cleemann
Represented By: Brittany Ashley McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?