Kirkpatrick v. Professional Account Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nathan Kirkpatrick and Nathan Kirkpatrick, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00335
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. See order for details. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 8/12/2019. (clou )
August 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller. #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (clou, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint by Professional Account Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sherman, Stephen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Howard Sherman on behalf of Professional Account Services, Inc. (Sherman, Stephen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Kirkpatrick, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated Professional Account Services, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019 (McLeod, Kenneth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Professional Account Services, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Nathan Kirkpatrick. (McLeod, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6714275.), filed by Nathan Kirkpatrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 8, 2018 Letters, #2 Exhibit B - November 21, 2018 Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLeod, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkpatrick v. Professional Account Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Kenneth Craig McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Kirkpatrick, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Kenneth Craig McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Account Services, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Howard Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?