Hecker v. Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority et al
Plaintiff: Blanche Elizabeth Hecker, Administrator of the Estate of Michael Steward Hoffler, Deceased,
Defendant: Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority, Natalya E. Moore, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00373
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Hearing by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Rosen, Jeff)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority.(Rosen, Jeff)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rosen, Jeff)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority. (Rosen, Jeff)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanche Elizabeth Hecker, Administrator of the Estate of Michael Steward Hoffler, Deceased, Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN served on 8/19/2019; Natalya E. Moore, LPN served on 8/19/2019; Alex P. Taylor, MD served on 8/20/2019; Freida R. Thomas, LPN served on 8/19/2019; Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority served on 8/19/2019 (Krudys, Mark) Modified docket text on 9/9/2019 - removed answer due date. Order #7 granting extension of time until 9/23/2019(dcou, ).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File: For good cause shown and finding it just and proper to do so, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendants shall file their responsive papers no later than September 23, 2019. Should a response from Plaintiff be required, that response shall be due no later than October 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 8/26/2019. (dcou, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order)(Rosen, Jeff)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority. (Rosen, Jeff)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Wayne Rosen on behalf of Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN, Alex P. Taylor, MD, Freida R. Thomas, LPN, Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority (Rosen, Jeff)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants - Main Document - Summ Issued- Duman. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summ Issued - Taylor, #2 Summ Issued - Thomas, #3 Summ Issued - Harrell, #4 Summ Issued - Moore, #5 Judge's Procedure for Civil Motions)(dcou, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Blanche Elizabeth Hecker, Administrator of the Estate of Michael Steward Hoffler, Deceased,. (Krudys, Mark)
July 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6740693.), filed by Blanche Elizabeth Hecker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krudys, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hecker v. Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freida R. Thomas, LPN
Represented By: Jeff Wayne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Tidewater Regional Jail Authority
Represented By: Jeff Wayne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalya E. Moore, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex P. Taylor, MD
Represented By: Jeff Wayne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany D. Harrell, LPN
Represented By: Jeff Wayne Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche Elizabeth Hecker, Administrator of the Estate of Michael Steward Hoffler, Deceased,
Represented By: Mark J. Krudys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?