S.S. v. Lassiter et al

Plaintiff: S. S.
Defendant: Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr. and Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00378
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 9/12/19. (afar)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial is set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on September 12, 2019. (sche)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge executed by Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC, Eglazia Brown, Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr, S. S. (sche)
September 12, 2019 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 9/12/2019. (sche)
September 5, 2019 Rule 16b Scheduling Conference reset for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. (sche)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/15/19 and filed 8/19/19. (lbax, )
August 12, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (afar)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC, Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr.(Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC, Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr (Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Workowski on behalf of Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC, Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr (Workowski, Sean)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. S. Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Booth, Edwin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S. S. Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Booth, Edwin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Two (2) Summons Issued as to Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC, Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
July 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by S. S.. (Booth, Edwin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by S. S.. (Booth, Edwin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6747851.), filed by S. S.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Booth, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.S. v. Lassiter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Richard Lassiter, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Sean C. Workowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blooming Fruiteurs, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Represented By: Sean C. Workowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. S.
Represented By: Edwin Stuart Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?