Walker v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Sharonda R. Walker
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Stores, Inc., Walmart Store #3216 and Wal-Mart Supercenter (Virginia Beach)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00389
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 and the Jury Trial is set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 8/19/19 and filed 8/20/19. (lbax, )
August 19, 2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on 8/19/2019. Jonathan R. Deloatche appeared for the Plaintiff. Karissa T. Kaseorg appeared for the Defendant. (lbax, )
August 9, 2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. (lbax, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/29/19 and filed 7/30/19. (lbax, )
July 23, 2019 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Supercenter (Virginia Beach), Walmart Store #3216, Walmart, Stores, Inc. (epri, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Supercenter (Virginia Beach), Walmart Store #3216, Walmart, Stores, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
July 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Walmart Stores Inc. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Gonzalez, Jonathan) (
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Supercenter (Virginia Beach), Walmart Store #3216, Walmart Stores Inc. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6752454.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Answer)(Gonzalez, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store #3216
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Supercenter (Virginia Beach)
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonda R. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?