Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Brown
Defendant: Samuel I. White, P.C. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00401
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/26/2020 at 12:00 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 and the Bench Trial is set for 4/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 2. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. on 9/26/19. (lbax, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Opposition to Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Marilyn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Michelle)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Opposition To Defendant Samuel I. White, P.C.s Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Marilyn Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. See order for details. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 9/17/2019. (clou)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 8/29/19. (lbax, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Marilyn Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Marilyn Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Marilyn Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paul, Michelle)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Marilyn Brown. (Paul, Michelle)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Loan Modification Denial)(Jones, Maryia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald James Guillot, Jr on behalf of Samuel I. White, P.C. (Guillot, Ronald)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit Notices of Sale, #3 Exhibit Deed of Foreclosure)(Cross, Aubrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Cross, Aubrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Samuel I. White, P.C.. (Cross, Aubrey)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey Michele Cross on behalf of Samuel I. White, P.C. (Cross, Aubrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
August 2, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing user has been requested to refile the Financial Interest Disclosure Statement as a separate docket entry. (epri, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
August 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6770186.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Jones, Maryia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel I. White, P.C.
Represented By: Aubrey Michele Cross
Represented By: Ronald James Guillot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kendall Hamilton Tan
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Brown
Represented By: Heath J Thompson
Represented By: Michelle Ann Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?