American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp. and American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen
Defendant: Kimberly Jenkins, Edward Kory Jenkins, Edward Kory Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor and Kimberly Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor
Case Number: 2:2019cv00407
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen. Kimberly Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor; and Edward Kory Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor, served on 8/13/19. (bpet, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen (Hartnett, David)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Mark Edward Opalisky as to American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 08/9/19. (tlev, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kimberly Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor; Edward Kory Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil motions procedures) (bpet, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen. (Hartnett, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen. (Hartnett, David)
August 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re 3 Proposed Summons, 2 Proposed Summons. Filing user was directed to refile the documents using non-fillable pdf forms. (epri, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Edward Opalisky and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Hartnett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6776848. by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Hartnett, David)
August 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Hartnett, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Hartnett, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Hartnett, David)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6775479.), filed by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartnett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corp. v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Kory Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Kory Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Jenkins, parent and guardian of K.J., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Strategic Insurance Corp, as subrogee of Debbie and Danny Hansen
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Mark Edward Opalisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?